Ashwin Magan Dental Surgery Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429038500978) was registered on 01 Apr 1996. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 5, Cbd Towers, 84 Main Street, Upper Hutt, 5140 (type: registered, physical). 3Rd Floor, Cbd Towers, 84 Main Street, Upper Hutt had been their registered address, up to 28 Jul 2016. Ashwin Magan Dental Surgery Limited used more aliases, namely: Hallmark Nominees Limited from 01 Apr 1996 to 07 May 1996. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Magan, Ashwin (an individual) located at Kaiwharawhara, Wellington postcode 6035. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Magan, Raksha (an individual) - located at Kaiwharawhara, Wellington. The Businesscheck database was updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3rd Floor, Cbd Towers, 84 Main Street, Upper Hutt, 5140 | Service & physical | 10 Jul 2014 |
Level 5, Cbd Towers, 84 Main Street, Upper Hutt, 5140 | Registered | 28 Jul 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ashwin Magan
Kaiwharawhara, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 07 Jul 2011 |
Director | 01 Apr 1996 - current |
Raksha Magan
Kaiwharawhara, Wellington, 6035
Address used since 07 Jul 2011 |
Director | 01 Apr 1996 - current |
Garth Osmond Melville
Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 1996 |
Director | 01 Apr 1996 - 01 Apr 1996 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3rd Floor, Cbd Towers, 84 Main Street, Upper Hutt, 5140 | Registered | 10 Jul 2014 - 28 Jul 2016 |
3rd Floor, Cbd Towers, 88 Main Street, Upper Hutt | Registered & physical | 31 Jul 2005 - 10 Jul 2014 |
C/- Hercus King 7 Co, Level 1, 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington | Registered | 14 Aug 2000 - 31 Jul 2005 |
85 College Hill Road, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 11 Apr 2000 - 14 Aug 2000 |
C/- Hercus King 7 Co, Level 4 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington | Registered | 31 Jul 1998 - 11 Apr 2000 |
Hercus King & Co, Level 1, 21-29 Broderick Road, Johnsonville, Wellington | Physical | 20 Aug 1997 - 31 Jul 2005 |
85 College Hill Road, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical | 20 Aug 1997 - 20 Aug 1997 |
85 College Hill Road, Ponsonby, Auckland | Registered | 15 May 1996 - 31 Jul 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Magan, Ashwin Individual |
Kaiwharawhara Wellington 6035 |
01 Apr 1996 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Magan, Raksha Individual |
Kaiwharawhara Wellington 6035 |
01 Apr 1996 - current |
Housemart (wgtn) Limited Level 5, Cbd Towers |
|
Scottys Meats 1 Limited 5/84 Main Street |
|
Parkview 23 Limited 5/84 Main Street |
|
Mahinui Developments Limited 84 Main Street |
|
Cpw Holdings Limited Level 5, Cbd Towers |
|
Woodridge Holdings Limited Level 5, Cbd Towers |