Ranfords United Travel Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429038900365) was launched on 24 Feb 1993. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 361 Paraite Road, Rd 3, New Plymouth, 4373 (type: registered, physical). 260 Broadway, Stratford, Stratford had been their physical address, up to 29 Apr 2021. 110000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 110000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Phillips, Marian Faye (a director) located at Rd 3, New Plymouth postcode 4373. "Travel agency service" (business classification N722060) is the category the ABS issued Ranfords United Travel Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
361 Paraite Road, Rd 3, New Plymouth, 4373 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Apr 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Marion Faye Phillips
Stratford, Taranaki, 4391
Address used since 14 Aug 2013 |
Director | 05 May 1993 - current |
Marian Faye Phillips
Rd 3, New Plymouth, 4373
Address used since 20 Apr 2021
Stratford, Taranaki, 4332
Address used since 23 Apr 2020
Stratford, Taranaki, 4391
Address used since 14 Aug 2013 |
Director | 05 May 1993 - current |
Thomas John Mills
Stratford, Taranaki, 4391
Address used since 14 Aug 2013 |
Director | 24 Feb 1993 - 23 Oct 2017 |
Peter Gordon Ranford
Hawera,
Address used since 24 Feb 1993 |
Director | 24 Feb 1993 - 05 May 1993 |
Noelene Joan Ranford
Hawera,
Address used since 24 Feb 1993 |
Director | 24 Feb 1993 - 05 May 1993 |
361 Paraite Road , Rd 3 , New Plymouth , 4373 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
260 Broadway, Stratford, Stratford, 4332 | Physical & registered | 04 May 2020 - 29 Apr 2021 |
616r Pembroke Road, Stratford, 4391 | Physical & registered | 16 May 2017 - 04 May 2020 |
87 Regan Street, Stratford, Stratford, 4332 | Registered & physical | 22 Aug 2013 - 16 May 2017 |
11 Stanners Street, Eltham | Physical & registered | 06 Oct 2004 - 22 Aug 2013 |
170 High Street, Hawera | Physical & registered | 06 Jun 1997 - 06 Oct 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phillips, Marian Faye Director |
Rd 3 New Plymouth 4373 |
09 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ranford, Peter Gordon Individual |
Hawera |
24 Feb 1993 - 20 Aug 2019 |
Mills, Thomas John Individual |
Stratford |
24 Feb 1993 - 24 Apr 2019 |
Phillips, Marion Faye Individual |
Stratford |
24 Feb 1993 - 09 Aug 2017 |
Horizon View Holdings Limited 505 Radnor Road |
|
Stratford Self Storage Limited 368 Monmouth Road |
|
Thompson Company Farms (2008) Limited 75 Barclay Road |
|
Kawhai Consultants Limited 194 Cardiff Road |
|
Aj & Ja Rowlands Limited 285 Radnor Road |
Egmont Travel Group Limited 11 Stanners Street |
Dtm Global Group Limited 3/17 Leatham Avenue |
Kiwi Travel NZ 2017 Limited 7 Liardet Street |
B S A Travel Limited 10 Young Street |
T&f New Zealand Education And Travel Service Limited 12 Somerset Road |
Makowhai Station Limited Cnr Wicksteed & Ingestre Streets |