Jade Boulder Gallery Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038919596) was launched on 23 Oct 1992. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 132 Moncks Spur Road, Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 (type: registered, physical). Level 4, 60 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 18 Jun 2018. 10000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 5000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Boustridge, Ian Charles (an individual) located at Greymouth 7805. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (5000 shares); it includes
Smith, Peter W (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Kumeu,
Forsyth, Paul Winstone (an individual) - located at Auckland Central, Auckland. Our information was last updated on 11 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25 Coates Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Service & physical | 23 Apr 2007 |
132 Moncks Spur Road, Redcliffs, Christchurch, 8081 | Registered | 18 Jun 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ian Charles Boustridge
Greymouth, 7805
Address used since 30 Nov 2015 |
Director | 23 Oct 1992 - current |
Keith Lance Laurie
Pt Chevalier, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Sep 1993 |
Director | 01 Sep 1993 - 18 Aug 1994 |
Paul Winstone Forsyth
Howick, Auckland,
Address used since 11 Dec 1992 |
Director | 11 Dec 1992 - 01 Sep 1993 |
Kay Frances Boustridge
Greymouth,
Address used since 02 Oct 1992 |
Director | 02 Oct 1992 - 25 Nov 1992 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 60 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered | 15 Dec 2017 - 18 Jun 2018 |
25 Coates Street, Greymouth, 7805 | Registered | 23 Apr 2007 - 15 Dec 2017 |
25 Coates St, Greymouth 7801 | Physical & registered | 19 Dec 2005 - 23 Apr 2007 |
1 Guinness Street, Greymouth | Registered & physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 19 Dec 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boustridge, Ian Charles Individual |
Greymouth 7805 |
23 Oct 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Peter W Individual |
Rd 1 Kumeu 0891 |
23 Oct 1992 - current |
Forsyth, Paul Winstone Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
23 Oct 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boustridge, Kay Frances Individual |
Greymouth 7805 |
23 Oct 1992 - 30 Nov 2021 |
Direct Paper Limited Level 4, 123 Victoria Street |
|
Ambrosia Nurseries Limited Level 4, 123 Victoria Street |
|
Eagle Direct Limited Level 4, 60 Cashel Street |
|
Zs Investments 2013 Limited Level 3, 50 Victoria Street |
|
Weeping Angels Limited Level 2, 329 Durham Street |
|
Interpret Geospatial Solutions Limited Level 1, 137 Victoria Street |