Jaws Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429038933394) was registered on 17 Sep 1992. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). Staples Rodway, Cnr Victoria & London Streets, Wel Energy Building 5Th Floor, Hamilton had been their physical address, until 07 Apr 2011. Jaws Holdings Limited used other aliases, namely: I.p. Valuations Limited from 17 Sep 1992 to 06 Mar 1995. 1000 shares are allocated to 21 shareholders who belong to 13 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 17 shares (1.7 per cent of shares), namely:
Robinson, Carrick James (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. When considering the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 12.6 per cent of all shares (126 shares); it includes
Tongariro Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at 12 O'connell Street, Auckland,
Hazel, James Augustine (an individual) - located at 22-32 Queen Street, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (126 shares, 12.6%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Jolly Rogers Trustees Limited, located at Devonport, Auckland (an entity). Our database was last updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 07 Apr 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ceri Peter Keston Wells
Hamilton, 3200
Address used since 14 Oct 2015 |
Director | 17 Sep 1992 - current |
Ian Finch
Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173
Address used since 10 Oct 2018
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 29 Oct 2013 |
Director | 17 Jun 2003 - current |
Jason Rogers
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 10 Oct 2018
Narrow Neck, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 14 Oct 2015 |
Director | 30 Jun 2006 - current |
Carrick James Robinson
Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 31 Mar 2011
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 12 Dec 2017 |
Director | 31 Mar 2011 - current |
James Augustine Hazel
22-32 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 31 Oct 2017 |
Director | 31 Oct 2017 - current |
Timothy Edward Walden
Rd 6, Hamilton, 3286
Address used since 31 Oct 2017 |
Director | 31 Oct 2017 - current |
Jonathan David Michael Lucas
Karaka, Papakura, 2113
Address used since 01 Apr 2020 |
Director | 01 Apr 2020 - current |
Kathryn Shelley Wilson
Rd 9, Hamilton, 3289
Address used since 05 May 2010 |
Director | 17 Sep 1992 - 31 Jan 2016 |
Simon Thomas Rowell
Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1060
Address used since 05 May 2010 |
Director | 09 Aug 2007 - 30 Sep 2012 |
John Derek Allen
Auckland Central, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Oct 1996 |
Director | 01 Oct 1996 - 17 Jun 2003 |
Barry Victor James
East Tamaki,
Address used since 17 Sep 1992 |
Director | 17 Sep 1992 - 04 Jul 1995 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Staples Rodway, Cnr Victoria & London Streets, Wel Energy Building 5th Floor, Hamilton | Physical | 09 Jun 2000 - 07 Apr 2011 |
Staples Rodway, 5thfloor, W E L Energy Building, Cnr Victoria & London Streets, Hamilton | Registered | 09 Jun 2000 - 07 Apr 2011 |
Ernst & Young, 5thfloor, W E L Energy Building, Cnr Victoria & London Streets, Hamilton | Registered | 09 Jun 2000 - 09 Jun 2000 |
Ernst & Young, Cnr Victoria & London Streets, Wel Energy Building 5th Floor, Hamilton | Physical | 09 Jun 2000 - 09 Jun 2000 |
Ernst & Young, 4th Floor, W E L Energy House, Cnr Victoria & London Streets, Hamilton | Registered | 28 May 1998 - 09 Jun 2000 |
Ernst & Young, Cnr Victoria & London Streets, Wel Energy Building 4th Floor, Hamilton | Physical | 01 May 1998 - 09 Jun 2000 |
121 Harris Road, East Tamaki, Auckland | Registered | 12 Sep 1996 - 28 May 1998 |
4th Floor, W.e.l. Energy House, 711 Victoria Street, Hamilton | Registered | 03 Nov 1993 - 12 Sep 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robinson, Carrick James Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Aug 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tongariro Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046199447 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
12 O'connell Street Auckland 1010 |
12 Dec 2017 - current |
Hazel, James Augustine Individual |
22-32 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
12 Dec 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jolly Rogers Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047961203 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
09 Feb 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nwm Trustees 155 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046387707 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
18 Jan 2018 - current |
Finch, Ian Individual |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 |
17 Sep 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexandra Tegan Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037576707 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
85 Alexandra Street Hamilton |
17 Sep 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lucas, Jonathan David Michael Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
03 Feb 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walden, Timothy Edward Individual |
Rd 6 Hamilton 3286 |
12 Dec 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hazel, James Augustine Individual |
22-32 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
12 Dec 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Walden, Gina Rose Individual |
Rd 6 Hamilton 3286 |
12 Dec 2017 - current |
Walden, Timothy Edward Individual |
Rd 6 Hamilton 3286 |
12 Dec 2017 - current |
Nimmo, Craig Antony Individual |
Sandringham Auckland 1025 |
12 Dec 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, Tania Karla Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Aug 2011 - current |
Robinson, Carrick James Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Aug 2011 - current |
Pitfield, Kevin David Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Aug 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lucas, Jennifer Anne Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
03 Feb 2021 - current |
Cb Trustees 4 Limited Other (Other) |
19 Morgan Street Newmarket, Auckland 1023 |
03 Feb 2021 - current |
Lucas, Jonathan David Michael Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
03 Feb 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Finch, Ian Individual |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 |
17 Sep 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wells, Ceri Peter Keston Individual |
Hamilton 3200 |
17 Sep 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lucas, Jonathan David Michael Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
03 Feb 2021 - 05 Feb 2021 |
Rogers, Jason Paul Individual |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
03 Apr 2007 - 03 Apr 2007 |
Rogers, Jason Paul Individual |
Halswell Christchurch |
03 Apr 2007 - 03 Apr 2007 |
Rowell, Simon Thomas Individual |
Hamilton East Hamilton 3216 |
19 Mar 2014 - 09 Feb 2021 |
Rowell, Simon Thomas Individual |
Hamilton East Hamilton 3216 |
19 Mar 2014 - 09 Feb 2021 |
Lucas, Jonathan David Michael Individual |
Karaka Papakura 2113 |
03 Feb 2021 - 05 Feb 2021 |
Finch, Ian Individual |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 |
22 Aug 2007 - 03 Feb 2021 |
Nwm Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037004040 Company Number: 1116509 Entity |
711 Victoria Street Hamilton 3204 |
22 Aug 2007 - 18 Jan 2018 |
Rogers, Paul Raymond Individual |
West Melton 7618 |
03 Apr 2007 - 09 Feb 2021 |
Rogers, Paul Raymond Individual |
West Melton West Melton 7618 |
03 Apr 2007 - 09 Feb 2021 |
Finch, Ian Individual |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
22 Aug 2007 - 03 Feb 2021 |
Finch, Ian Individual |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
22 Aug 2007 - 03 Feb 2021 |
Finch, Ian Individual |
Rd 3 Tauranga 3173 |
22 Aug 2007 - 03 Feb 2021 |
Rogers, Jason Paul Individual |
Devonport Auckland 0624 |
03 Apr 2007 - 03 Apr 2007 |
Rowell, Simon Thomas Individual |
Mt Wellington Auckland |
03 Apr 2007 - 30 Oct 2013 |
Wilson, Kathryn Shelley Individual |
R D 9 Hamilton |
17 Sep 1992 - 19 Oct 2016 |
Rowell, John David Individual |
Mt Wellington Auckland |
21 Aug 2008 - 30 Oct 2013 |
Null - The Triple F Trust Other |
17 Sep 1992 - 15 May 2007 | |
Rogers, Jason Paul Individual |
Halswell Christchurch |
03 Apr 2007 - 03 Apr 2007 |
Rogers, Jason Paul Individual |
Halswell Christchurch |
03 Apr 2007 - 03 Apr 2007 |
Rebecca Benjamin Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037644925 Company Number: 948718 Entity |
17 Sep 1992 - 19 Oct 2016 | |
Rogers, Jason Paul Individual |
Halswell Christchurch |
03 Apr 2007 - 03 Apr 2007 |
Rowell, Simon Thomas Individual |
Mt Wellington Auckland |
21 Aug 2008 - 30 Oct 2013 |
The Triple F Trust Other |
17 Sep 1992 - 15 May 2007 | |
Rebecca Benjamin Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037644925 Company Number: 948718 Entity |
17 Sep 1992 - 19 Oct 2016 | |
Nwm Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037004040 Company Number: 1116509 Entity |
711 Victoria Street Hamilton 3204 |
22 Aug 2007 - 18 Jan 2018 |
Nwm Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037004040 Company Number: 1116509 Entity |
711 Victoria Street Hamilton 3204 |
22 Aug 2007 - 18 Jan 2018 |
Turner & Townsend Thinc New Zealand Pty Limited 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
|
Domain Vault Limited 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
|
Landmark Operations (nz) Limited 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
|
Sampson Corporate Trustee Limited 18 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
|
Serco New Zealand Training Limited Level 4, Kpmg Centre |
|
General Management Holdings Limited 18 Vidauct Harbour Avenue |