Manawatu Concrete Pumping & Spraying Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429038951268) was registered on 08 Sep 1992. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 105 Richardsons Line, Rd 8, Palmerston North, 4478 (type: registered, physical). 275 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North had been their physical address, up to 24 Feb 2015. 5000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 2500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Reichenbach, Neville Shane (an individual) located at Palmerston North. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (2500 shares); it includes
Reichenbach, Gayle Marie (an individual) - located at Palmerston North. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
105 Richardsons Line, Rd 8, Palmerston North, 4478 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Feb 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Neville Shane Reichenbach
Rd 8, Palmerston North, 4478
Address used since 15 Oct 2015 |
Director | 08 Sep 1992 - current |
Gayle Marie Reichenbach
Rd 8, Palmerston North, 4478
Address used since 15 Oct 2015 |
Director | 15 Oct 1996 - current |
Herman Peter Stuifzand
Palmerston North,
Address used since 08 Sep 1992 |
Director | 08 Sep 1992 - 15 Oct 1996 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
275 Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North | Physical & registered | 13 Nov 2006 - 24 Feb 2015 |
275a Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North | Physical & registered | 02 Nov 2004 - 13 Nov 2006 |
275 Broadway Avenue, Palmeston North | Physical | 29 Jan 1997 - 02 Nov 2004 |
C/- Hay Mckay & Associates,, Chartered Accountants,, 275 Broadway Avenue,, Palmerston North. | Registered | 29 Jan 1997 - 02 Nov 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reichenbach, Neville Shane Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Sep 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Reichenbach, Gayle Marie Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Sep 1992 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mckay, James Desmond Individual |
Palmerston North |
08 Sep 1992 - 03 Oct 2013 |
Taranaki Concrete Pumping And Spraying Limited 105 Richardsons Line |
|
Quality Pools Limited 105 Richardsons Line |
|
Expobar Espresso Limited 52 Setters Line |
|
Storage Hq Limited 52 Setters Line |
|
Gq Holdings Limited 52 Setters Line |
|
Quantock-holmes Investments Limited 52 Setters Line |