Movement Twenty Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039010780) was incorporated on 02 Mar 1992. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 6, 14 Viaduct Harbour Drive, Auckland City (type: registered, physical). C/-Ernst & Young, Level 14,41 Shortland Street, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 22 Jun 2006. 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Merida Limited (an entity) located at Auckland City. Businesscheck's database was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 6, 14 Viaduct Harbour Drive, Auckland City | Registered & physical & service | 22 Jun 2006 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Andrew Bagnall
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 30 Sep 1993 |
Director | 30 Sep 1993 - current |
Colin David Mindel
Torbay, Auckland,
Address used since 30 Sep 1993 |
Director | 30 Sep 1993 - 17 Apr 2008 |
Peter Boyd Guise
Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Mar 1992 |
Director | 02 Mar 1992 - 30 Sep 1993 |
Denis Vincent Drumm
Mt Albert, Auckland,
Address used since 02 Mar 1992 |
Director | 02 Mar 1992 - 30 Sep 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-ernst & Young, Level 14,41 Shortland Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 23 Aug 2005 - 22 Jun 2006 |
11th Floor, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland 1 | Physical | 07 Aug 2001 - 07 Aug 2001 |
Staples Rodway Ltd, 11th Floor, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 07 Aug 2001 - 23 Aug 2005 |
11th Floor, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland 1 | Registered | 07 Aug 2001 - 23 Aug 2005 |
11th Floor Southpac Tower, 45 Queen Street, Auckland 1 | Registered & physical | 01 Aug 2000 - 07 Aug 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Merida Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036121205 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland City |
17 Apr 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stapway Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032248111 Company Number: 108454 Entity |
02 Mar 1992 - 17 Apr 2008 | |
Stapway Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032248111 Company Number: 108454 Entity |
02 Mar 1992 - 17 Apr 2008 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |