Vincent Land Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039034380) was incorporated on 27 Mar 1992. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 46-48 Russell Street, Alexandra, 9320 (type: registered, physical). Flat 46, 48 Russell Street, Alexandra had been their registered address, until 02 Mar 2012. Vincent Land Holdings Limited used other aliases, namely: Vincent Holdings Limited from 28 Mar 1992 to 18 Sep 2018, Vencent Holdings Limited (27 Mar 1992 to 28 Mar 1992). 4000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 4 entities and holds 3500 shares (87.5% of shares), namely:
Robertson, Kade John (an individual) located at Alexandra, Alexandra postcode 9320,
Robertson, Joel Geoffrey (an individual) located at Alexandra, Alexandra postcode 9320,
Robertson, Kyla Anne (an individual) located at Alexandra, Alexandra postcode 9320. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 12.5% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Robertson, Albert Walter John (an individual) - located at Alexandra, Alexandra. Businesscheck's information was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
46-48 Russell Street, Alexandra, 9320 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Mar 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Albert Walter John Robertson
Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320
Address used since 26 Feb 2015 |
Director | 18 Nov 2003 - current |
Peter Matthew Green
Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320
Address used since 18 Feb 2016 |
Director | 10 Apr 1992 - 27 Jun 2024 |
Gordon Bates Taylor
Alexandra,
Address used since 29 Jan 2003 |
Director | 10 Apr 1992 - 01 Apr 2007 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 46, 48 Russell Street, Alexandra | Registered & physical | 28 Jun 2006 - 02 Mar 2012 |
C/- Ernst & Young Ltd, 6th Floor Ernst & Young House, 227 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 05 Feb 2003 - 28 Jun 2006 |
Ernst & Young, 6th Floor Ernst & Young House, 227 Cambridge Terrace, Christchurch 8000 | Registered | 21 Feb 2001 - 05 Feb 2003 |
C/- Ernst & Young, Ernst & Young House, 227 Cambrigde Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 21 Feb 2001 - 21 Feb 2001 |
C/- Robert Cooper, 14 Tarbert Street, Alexandra | Registered | 31 Jan 1997 - 21 Feb 2001 |
C/- Spicer & Oppenheim, 14 Tarbert Street, Alexandra | Registered | 21 Dec 1993 - 31 Jan 1997 |
- | Registered | 27 Mar 1992 - 21 Dec 1993 |
C/- Ernat & Young, Ernst & Young House, 227 Cambrigde Terrace, Christchurch | Physical | 27 Mar 1992 - 21 Feb 2001 |
- | Physical | 27 Mar 1992 - 27 Mar 1992 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson, Kade John Individual |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 |
24 Jun 2024 - current |
Robertson, Joel Geoffrey Individual |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 |
25 Jan 2021 - current |
Robertson, Kyla Anne Individual |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 |
08 May 2008 - current |
Robertson, Albert Walter John Individual |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 |
08 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson, Albert Walter John Individual |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 |
26 Jan 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Green, Sharon Brigid Individual |
Alexandra |
08 May 2008 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Green, Sharon Brigid Individual |
Alexandra |
08 May 2008 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Green, Sharon Brigid Individual |
Alexandra |
08 May 2008 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Green, Peter Matthew Individual |
Alexandra |
27 Mar 1992 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Green, Peter Matthew Individual |
Alexandra |
08 May 2008 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Green, Peter Matthew Individual |
Alexandra |
08 May 2008 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Green, Peter Matthew Individual |
Alexandra |
08 May 2008 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Corrigall, Abby Rachel Individual |
Waterloo Nsw 2017 |
21 Sep 2017 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Corrigall, Abby Rachel Individual |
Waterloo Nsw 2017 |
21 Sep 2017 - 03 Jul 2024 |
Central Lodge Trustees 2006 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034249765 Company Number: 1784424 Entity |
69 Tarbert Street Alexandra 9320 |
08 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2017 |
Central Lodge Trustees 2006 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034249765 Company Number: 1784424 Entity |
69 Tarbert Street Alexandra 9320 |
08 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2017 |
Central Lodge Trustees 2006 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034249765 Company Number: 1784424 Entity |
08 May 2008 - 21 Sep 2017 | |
Taylor, Gordon Bates Individual |
Alexandra |
27 Mar 1992 - 11 Oct 2007 |
Kentron Limited 42 Russell Street |
|
Kado Limited 51a Russell Street |
|
C & C Enterprises (otago) Limited 51a Russell Street |
|
Crag-an-oir Orchard Limited 51a Russell Street |
|
Ultraspan (otago) Limited 51a Russell Street |
|
Central Otago Flooring Limited 51a Russell Street |