Wayne Allen Limited (NZBN 9429039239662) was launched on 26 Feb 1990. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 133 Whitford Park Road, Rd 1, Whitford, 2576 (type: office, delivery). Suite 9, 145 Nelson Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 09 Mar 2015. Wayne Allen Limited used more aliases, namely: Wayne Allen Insurances Limited from 26 Feb 1990 to 25 Nov 1993. 10000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 5000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Slj Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Rd 1, Whitford postcode 2576,
Allen, Wayne Ramon (an individual) located at Rd 1, Manurewa postcode 2576,
Allen, Wayne Ramon (an individual) located at Rd 1, Manurewa postcode 2576. Our data was last updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
133 Whitford Park Road, Rd 1, Manurewa, 2576 | Physical & registered & service | 09 Mar 2015 |
133 Whitford Park Road, Rd 1, Whitford, 2576 | Office | 24 Apr 2019 |
133 Whitford Park Road, Rd 1, Manurewa, 2576 | Delivery | 24 Apr 2019 |
Po Box 151, Whitford, Auckland, 2149 | Postal | 24 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wayne Ramon Allen
Rd 1, Manurewa, 2576
Address used since 08 Apr 2015 |
Director | 26 Feb 1990 - current |
Sarah Tesniere
Rd 1, Whitford, 2576
Address used since 01 Aug 2021 |
Director | 01 Aug 2021 - current |
Amanda Jean Allen
Rd 1, Manurewa, 2576
Address used since 08 Apr 2015 |
Director | 01 Apr 1993 - 09 Jul 2020 |
Jean Isobel Allen
Tauranga,
Address used since 26 Feb 1990 |
Director | 26 Feb 1990 - 01 Apr 1993 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Po Box 151, Whitford, Auckland, 2149 | Postal | 24 Apr 2019 |
133 Whitford Park Road , Rd 1 , Whitford , 2576 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 9, 145 Nelson Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 06 Dec 2011 - 09 Mar 2015 |
54 Whitford Park Rd, Whitford | Registered | 19 Mar 2007 - 06 Dec 2011 |
54 Whitford Park Road, Whitford, Auckland | Physical | 19 Mar 2007 - 06 Dec 2011 |
Same As Registered Office Address | Physical | 01 Jul 1998 - 01 Jul 1998 |
133 Whitford Park Road, Whitford | Physical | 01 Jul 1998 - 19 Mar 2007 |
67 Wakelin Road, Beachlands, Auckland | Registered | 01 Mar 1997 - 19 Mar 2007 |
300 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland | Registered | 20 Jun 1995 - 01 Mar 1997 |
255 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland | Registered | 25 Jun 1992 - 20 Jun 1995 |
- | Physical | 21 Feb 1992 - 01 Jul 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Slj Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047336162 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 1 Whitford 2576 |
25 Jan 2021 - current |
Allen, Wayne Ramon Individual |
Rd 1 Manurewa 2576 |
01 Mar 2010 - current |
Allen, Wayne Ramon Individual |
Rd 1 Manurewa 2576 |
26 Feb 1990 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allen, Amanda Jean Individual |
Rd 1 Manurewa 2576 |
26 Feb 1990 - 25 Jan 2021 |
Allen, Amanda Jean Individual |
Rd 1 Manurewa 2576 |
01 Mar 2010 - 25 Jan 2021 |
Allen Development Trustees Limited 133 Whitford Park Road |
|
Af Marketing Limited 133 Whitford Park Road |
|
Ivan Frisken Estates Limited 172 Whitford Park Road |
|
Endura Estates Limited 172 Whitford Park Road |
|
Spire Enterprises Limited 36 Brownhill Road |
|
Queenstown Investments Limited 36 Brownhill Road |