Snackwell Foods Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429039280824) was launched on 20 Oct 1989. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 35 Aintree Ave, Mangere, Auckland (type: registered, physical). 20 B Sylvia Park Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland had been their registered address, until 01 May 1999. Snackwell Foods Limited used other names, namely: Asian Cuisines Limited from 20 Oct 1989 to 13 Jan 1995. 2 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 2 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Tan, Pam Cham Chee (an individual) located at 19 Franklin Road, Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Tan, Peter Chye Cheng (an individual) located at 19 Franklin Road, Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Gl Tan Guardian Limited (an entity) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. Our data was updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
35 Aintree Ave, Mangere, Auckland | Registered & physical & service | 01 May 1999 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Pam Cham Chee Tan
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 25 Oct 1989 |
Director | 25 Oct 1989 - current |
Peter Chye Cheng Tan
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 25 Oct 1989 |
Director | 25 Oct 1989 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
20 B Sylvia Park Road, Mt Wellington, Auckland | Registered | 01 May 1999 - 01 May 1999 |
Same As Registered Office | Physical | 01 May 1999 - 01 May 1999 |
- | Physical | 21 Feb 1992 - 01 May 1999 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tan, Pam Cham Chee Individual |
19 Franklin Road Freemans Bay, Auckland |
04 Apr 2008 - current |
Tan, Peter Chye Cheng Individual |
19 Franklin Road Freemans Bay, Auckland |
04 Apr 2008 - current |
Gl Tan Guardian Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048864145 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
29 Mar 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Asbury, David John Individual |
76 Kitenui Avenue Mt Albert, Auckland |
04 Apr 2008 - 29 Mar 2021 |
Tan, Peter Chye Cheng Individual |
19 Franklin Road Freemans Bay, Auckland |
20 Oct 1989 - 04 Apr 2008 |
Tan, Pam Cham Chee Individual |
19 Franklin Road Freemans Bay, Auckland |
20 Oct 1989 - 04 Apr 2008 |
Chrismo NZ Pty Limited 20d Sylvia Park Road |
|
Big Bite Limited 20q Sylvia Park Road |
|
Secure Monitoring Limited 20h Sylvia Park Road |
|
Secure Integrated Solutions Limited 20h Sylvia Park Road |
|
Eurotech Auto Repair Centre Limited Unit G, 20 Sylvia Park Road |
|
Stratex Group Limited 19-21 Sylvia Park Road |