Omakau Area Irrigation Company Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429039301147) was incorporated on 13 Sep 1989. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 21 Brandon Street, Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320 (type: physical, registered). C/-Checketts Mckay, Level 1, 77 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra had been their physical address, up to 07 Jul 2015. 117280 shares are issued to 10 shareholders who belong to 10 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 6360 shares (5.42% of shares), namely:
Heckler, Murray John (an individual) located at R D 2, Omakau. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 4.37% of all shares (exactly 5120 shares); it includes
Milkwell Holdings Limited (an entity) - located at Papanui, Christchurch. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (5140 shares, 4.38%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Morgan, Richard James, located at R D 1, Omakau (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
21 Brandon Street, Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320 | Physical & registered & service | 07 Jul 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray John Heckler
Rd 2, Omakau, 9377
Address used since 23 Aug 2016 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - current |
Antony William Glassford
Rd 1, Omakau, 9376
Address used since 04 Nov 2008 |
Director | 04 Nov 2008 - current |
Andrew Arran Paterson
Rd 1, Omakau, 9376
Address used since 19 Oct 2010 |
Director | 19 Oct 2010 - current |
Jan-maree Helen Manson
Rd 1, Omakau, 9376
Address used since 07 Jul 2016 |
Director | 08 Nov 2011 - current |
Philip David Baxter Smith
Rd 2, Omakau, 9377
Address used since 05 Dec 2013 |
Director | 20 Nov 2013 - current |
Scott William James Armstrong
Rd 2, Omakau, 9377
Address used since 27 Nov 2014 |
Director | 27 Nov 2014 - current |
Hamish Craig Stratford
Rd 1, Omakau, 9376
Address used since 25 Nov 2021 |
Director | 25 Nov 2021 - current |
Michael Henry Williams
Rd 1, Omakau, 9376
Address used since 24 Nov 2022 |
Director | 24 Nov 2022 - current |
Richard James Morgan
Omakau, Omakau, 9376
Address used since 23 Aug 2016 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - 24 Nov 2022 |
Thomas Gerard Flannery
Rd 2, Oturehua, 9387
Address used since 04 Nov 2008 |
Director | 04 Nov 2008 - 25 Nov 2021 |
David Bruce Naylor
Becks, R D 2, Omakau,
Address used since 13 Sep 1989 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - 27 Nov 2014 |
William John Hinchey
Rd 3, Alexandra 9393,
Address used since 10 May 2007 |
Director | 10 May 2007 - 20 Nov 2013 |
Andrew Laurence Nelson Manson
Rd 1, Omakau 9376,
Address used since 04 Nov 2008 |
Director | 04 Nov 2008 - 08 Nov 2011 |
Stephen James Brown
Omakau 9377, 9376
Address used since 15 Sep 2007 |
Director | 15 Sep 2007 - 19 Oct 2010 |
Gary Oswald Gordon-glassford
Matakanui, R D 1, Omakau,
Address used since 13 Sep 1989 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - 12 Nov 2008 |
Garry Adrian Wilson
R D 1, Omakau,
Address used since 13 Sep 1989 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - 12 Nov 2008 |
Murray Renton Jack
R D 2, Omakau,
Address used since 19 May 2000 |
Director | 19 May 2000 - 12 Nov 2008 |
William Lindsay Geddes
Matakanui, Rd 1, Omakau,
Address used since 07 Nov 2001 |
Director | 07 Nov 2001 - 27 Sep 2007 |
Peter Edward Kerr
Omakau,
Address used since 16 Nov 2002 |
Director | 16 Nov 2002 - 10 May 2007 |
Donald Edward Maclean
R D 1, Omakau,
Address used since 13 Sep 1989 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - 16 Nov 2002 |
Edwin James Berry
Matakanui, R D 1, Omakau,
Address used since 13 Sep 1989 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - 30 Sep 2001 |
Thomas Mathew Moran
R D 2, Omakau,
Address used since 13 Sep 1989 |
Director | 13 Sep 1989 - 19 May 2000 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-checketts Mckay, Level 1, 77 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra | Physical & registered | 07 Nov 2008 - 07 Jul 2015 |
C/o Checketts Mckay, 32 Centennial Avenue, Alexandra | Registered | 02 Feb 1993 - 07 Nov 2008 |
- | Physical | 21 Feb 1992 - 21 Feb 1992 |
C/- Checketts Mckay, 31 Tarbert Street, Alexandra | Physical | 21 Feb 1992 - 07 Nov 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heckler, Murray John Individual |
R D 2 Omakau |
13 Sep 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Milkwell Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036117925 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Papanui Christchurch 8053 |
28 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morgan, Richard James Individual |
R D 1 Omakau |
13 Sep 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kye Farming Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033267692 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Alexandra 9320 |
29 Jun 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Two Farmers Farming Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046346582 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Papanui Christchurch 8053 |
15 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Satinburn Dairy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040989792 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Alexandra 9320 |
26 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Knapdale Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031262941 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Alexandra 9320 |
23 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lilybank Co Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047101821 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Invercargill Invercargill 9810 |
15 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Manchester Dairy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034063033 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Alexandra 9320 |
13 Sep 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wildon Dairy Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041377376 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Alexandra 9320 |
23 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig, William Arthur Individual |
Matakanui |
28 May 2009 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Ga & Ja Wilson Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036801282 Company Number: 1156600 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 26 May 2008 | |
Groundwater, Alistair Paul Individual |
Rd 1 Omakau 9376 |
28 May 2014 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Satinburn Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037385729 Company Number: 1011387 Entity |
21 May 2004 - 21 May 2004 | |
Tinkers Creek Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036920792 Company Number: 1134944 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 26 May 2008 | |
Groundwater, Barbara Jean Individual |
Rd 1 Omakau 9376 |
28 May 2014 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Groundwater, Barbara Jean Individual |
Rd 1 Omakau 9376 |
28 May 2014 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Ga & Ja Wilson Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036801282 Company Number: 1156600 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 26 May 2008 | |
Coutts, Grant Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
24 Jul 2014 - 15 Jul 2019 |
Fyfe, Ian Grant Individual |
R D 2, Wanaka |
28 May 2009 - 15 Jul 2019 |
Tiger Hill Farm Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038016189 Company Number: 871966 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 24 Jul 2014 | |
Kynlallan Farming Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032667394 Company Number: 2149143 Entity |
28 May 2014 - 23 Aug 2016 | |
Shade Plus Central Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036801282 Company Number: 1156600 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 26 May 2008 | |
Murphy, Suzanne Dorothy Individual |
Omakau |
21 May 2004 - 23 Jul 2018 |
Groundwater, Mark David Individual |
Rd 1 Omakau 9376 |
28 May 2014 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Wrenn, Kevin Phillip Individual |
Omakau |
28 May 2009 - 23 Jul 2018 |
Mcleod, Peter Thomas Individual |
Matakanui |
13 Sep 1989 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Gillespie, Alan William Individual |
R D 2 Wanaka |
26 May 2008 - 15 Jul 2019 |
Anderson, Stephen Laud Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
24 Jul 2014 - 15 Jul 2019 |
Coutts, Russell Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
24 Jul 2014 - 15 Jul 2019 |
Maclean, Donald Edward Individual |
Omakau Omakau 9376 |
30 Jun 2015 - 23 Aug 2016 |
Maclean, Donald Edward Individual |
Omakau |
13 Sep 1989 - 29 Jun 2015 |
Satinburn Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037385729 Company Number: 1011387 Entity |
21 May 2004 - 21 May 2004 | |
Tiger Hill Farm Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038016189 Company Number: 871966 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 24 Jul 2014 | |
Kynlallan Farming Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032667394 Company Number: 2149143 Entity |
28 May 2014 - 23 Aug 2016 | |
Shade Plus Central Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036801282 Company Number: 1156600 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 26 May 2008 | |
Wilson, Bevan William Individual |
Omakau |
13 Sep 1989 - 29 Jun 2015 |
Mcleod, Robyn Louise Individual |
Matakanui |
28 May 2009 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Knapdale Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031262941 Company Number: 3233496 Entity |
29 Jun 2015 - 26 Jul 2017 | |
Null - Kye Farming Ltd Other |
26 May 2008 - 24 Jul 2014 | |
Murphy, Barry William Individual |
Omakau |
21 May 2004 - 23 Jul 2018 |
Kye Farming Ltd Other |
26 May 2008 - 24 Jul 2014 | |
Knapdale Farms Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031262941 Company Number: 3233496 Entity |
29 Jun 2015 - 26 Jul 2017 | |
Gillespie, Janice Ann Individual |
R D 2 Wanaka |
26 May 2008 - 15 Jul 2019 |
Tinkers Creek Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036920792 Company Number: 1134944 Entity |
13 Sep 1989 - 26 May 2008 | |
Groundwater, Alistair Paul Individual |
Rd 1 Omakau 9376 |
28 May 2014 - 24 Jul 2014 |
Cronfa Fach Limited 21 Brandon Street |
|
Checketts Mckay Law Limited 21 Brandon Street |
|
Arrowstone Projects Limited 21 Brandon Street |
|
No Chance Water Company Limited 21 Brandon Street |
|
Gdb (2006) Limited 21 Brandon Street |
|
Kiwi Custom Solutions Limited 21 Brandon Street |