Ulysses Lending Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039309532) was launched on 20 Oct 1989. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 5 Franklin Road, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 (type: registered, physical). Zone 23, Unit G10, 23 Edwin Street, Mt Eden, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 26 Aug 2019. Ulysses Lending Limited used other aliases, namely: Bearer Limited from 14 Dec 1998 to 13 Mar 2019, Black Cat Eats Out Limited (03 May 1993 to 14 Dec 1998) and Jack Brian Services Limited (24 Aug 1990 - 03 May 1993). 10000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 10000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Jts2014 Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011,
Brian, Allan Jack (an individual) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011. Businesscheck's data was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Franklin Road, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical & service | 26 Aug 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Allan Jack Brian
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 22 Mar 2018
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 03 Nov 2014 |
Director | 07 Sep 1990 - current |
Gael Maureen Hotchin
R D 6, Warkworth,
Address used since 07 Sep 1990 |
Director | 07 Sep 1990 - 10 Dec 1992 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Zone 23, Unit G10, 23 Edwin Street, Mt Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered & physical | 14 Jan 2013 - 26 Aug 2019 |
Grange Associates Ltd, 4 Grange Road, Mt Eden, Auckland | Registered & physical | 10 Jul 2006 - 14 Jan 2013 |
C/- Brian Associates, 532 Parnell Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered | 11 Jan 1999 - 10 Jul 2006 |
2nd Floor, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 11 Jan 1999 - 10 Jul 2006 |
C/- Brian Associates, 532 Parnell Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 11 Jan 1999 - 11 Jan 1999 |
Level 1, Bldg 5, Central Park, Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland | Physical & registered | 30 Sep 1997 - 11 Jan 1999 |
Level 2, Building 5, Central Park, 666 Great South Road, Penrose, Auckland | Registered | 18 Apr 1997 - 30 Sep 1997 |
9th Floor, Lorne Towers, 10-14 Lorne Street, Auckland | Registered | 19 Nov 1993 - 18 Apr 1997 |
8th Floor, Guildford House, 1-9 Beach Road, Auckland | Registered | 12 Feb 1992 - 19 Nov 1993 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jts2014 Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041385746 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
02 Oct 2023 - current |
Brian, Allan Jack Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
20 Oct 1989 - current |
Kaimai Wind Farm Limited Apartment G12, 23 Edwin Street |
|
Reliving Limited Unit G-12, 23 Edwin Street |
|
Cota Holdings Limited G12, 23 Edwin Street |
|
Inkbox Limited G12, 23 Edwin Street |
|
2 Z Properties Limited G12, 23 Edwin Street |
|
Nztaxagent Limited Suite 16 Floor G, 23 Edwin Street |