Agpower Sale & Service N.z. Limited (issued a business number of 9429039360649) was incorporated on 05 Apr 1989. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 (type: registered, physical). Cnr Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings had been their physical address, until 22 Dec 2017. Agpower Sale & Service N.z. Limited used more aliases, namely: Claverley Investments Limited from 05 Apr 1989 to 15 Nov 1989. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Evans, Rex Owen (an individual) located at Rd 9, Feilding postcode 4779. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 24 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Cnr Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings | Other (Address for Records) | 25 May 2009 |
5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 14 Dec 2017 |
5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 | Registered & physical & service | 22 Dec 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Rex Owen Evans
Rd 9, Feilding, 4779
Address used since 01 Mar 2024
Rd 1, Waipukurau, 4281
Address used since 10 Apr 2013 |
Director | 20 Nov 1990 - current |
Julia May Evans
Onga Onga,
Address used since 20 Nov 1990 |
Director | 20 Nov 1990 - 23 Mar 2009 |
Martin Van Steel
Rd 2, Danmiurke, Australia,
Address used since 01 May 1989 |
Director | 01 May 1989 - 24 Oct 1990 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Cnr Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings, 4156 | Physical & registered | 20 Apr 2015 - 22 Dec 2017 |
Barnes Kirk & Associates, 202-204 N Warren Street, Hastings | Registered & physical | 30 Mar 1998 - 30 Mar 1998 |
Cnr Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings | Registered & physical | 30 Mar 1998 - 20 Apr 2015 |
Coopers & Lybrand, 202-204 N Warren Street, Hastings | Registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 30 Mar 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Evans, Rex Owen Individual |
Rd 9 Feilding 4779 |
05 Apr 1989 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Evans, Julia May Individual |
Onga Onga |
05 Apr 1989 - 14 Sep 2011 |
Mapua Coastal Village Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Bruce Investments Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
On Trak Trustee Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Dames Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Newtons Flat Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Wg & Je Chambers Limited 5 Havelock Road |