Scotts Caravans Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039535672) was launched on 23 Sep 1987. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 39 St Vincent Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (type: registered, physical). 7A Miro Road, Green Lane, Auckland had been their registered address, until 24 Mar 2014. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Jd Scott, Estate Of (an individual) located at Maraetai 2018. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Scott, Pamela Isabel (an individual) - located at Maraetai 2018. "Administrative service nec" (business classification N729905) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Scotts Caravans Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
39 St Vincent Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Mar 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Pamela Isabel Scott
Maraetai, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 01 Jun 2016 |
Director | 23 Sep 1987 - current |
John Douglas Scott
Takanini,
Address used since 23 Sep 1987 |
Director | 23 Sep 1987 - 20 Sep 2001 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
7a Miro Road, Green Lane, Auckland | Registered & physical | 05 Mar 2004 - 24 Mar 2014 |
39 St Vincent Avenue, Remuera, Auckland | Physical | 30 Jun 1997 - 05 Mar 2004 |
15 Oakleigh Ave, Takanini, South Auckland | Registered | 30 Jun 1997 - 05 Mar 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jd Scott, Estate Of Individual |
Maraetai 2018 |
23 Sep 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott, Pamela Isabel Individual |
Maraetai 2018 |
23 Sep 1987 - current |
T K Holdings Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
|
Sandbrooks Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
|
Sandavid Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
|
Mcr Trustee Company Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
|
Hsc Holdings Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
|
Property Investments Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
Drury Holdings Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
Bingley Investments Limited 39 St Vincent Avenue |
Cpg Limited 21 Market Road |
Number One Print Management Limited 9 Matai Road |
Nilen Properties Limited 94 Ladies Mile |
The Education Group Limited Level 1, Vtr House |