Grim Reaper Lures & Tackle (Nz) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039613431) was launched on 02 Jun 1987. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1St Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Red Beach, Auckland, 0932 (type: registered, physical). 1St Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Red Beach, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 07 Apr 2022. Grim Reaper Lures & Tackle (Nz) Limited used more names, namely: Bill Houston Agencies Limited from 02 Jun 1987 to 08 Aug 1997. 10000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 5000 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Houston, David (an individual) located at Ramarama, Rd 3, Drury 2579. Our data was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Red Beach, Auckland, 0932 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 01 Mar 2011 |
1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Red Beach, Auckland, 0932 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Houston
Rd 3, Drury, 2579
Address used since 24 Mar 2010 |
Director | 11 Jul 1998 - current |
William Houston
Rd 3, Drury, 2579
Address used since 24 Mar 2010 |
Director | 11 Nov 1987 - 01 Mar 2016 |
Marie Houston
Pakuranga,
Address used since 11 Nov 1987 |
Director | 11 Nov 1987 - 11 Jul 1998 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Red Beach, Auckland, 0932 | Physical & registered | 09 Mar 2011 - 07 Apr 2022 |
168 Hibiscus Coast Highway, Orewa 0932 | Registered & physical | 11 May 2009 - 09 Mar 2011 |
C/- Stanford & Co, 1/125 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland | Registered & physical | 12 Mar 2002 - 11 May 2009 |
C/- Stanford & Co Ltd, 532 Parnell Road, Newmarket | Physical | 09 Aug 2000 - 09 Aug 2000 |
C/- Stanford & Co Limited, 532 Parnell Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 09 Aug 2000 - 12 Mar 2002 |
C/- Stanford Foster And Co, 3rd Floor, 76 Symond St, Auckland 2 | Physical | 22 Jul 2000 - 09 Aug 2000 |
C/- Stanford Foster And Co, 3rd Floor, 76 Symond St, Auckland 2 | Registered | 30 Aug 1998 - 12 Mar 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Houston, David Individual |
Ramarama Rd 3, Drury 2579 |
02 Jun 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Houston, William Individual |
Ramarama Rd 3, Drury 2579 |
02 Jun 1987 - 24 Jul 2017 |
Houston, Marie Individual |
Pukekohe Pukekohe 2120 |
24 Jul 2017 - 24 Jul 2017 |
Aylett Investigations Limited 1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
Kerry Wells Trust Services Limited 1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
Ckings Limited 1st Floor |
|
Holloway Trustees Limited 1st Floor 178 |
|
Riverside Property Concepts Limited 1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway |
|
R G Barge Limited 1st Floor, 178 Hibiscus Coast Highway |