Beadle Control Services Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039616180) was launched on 06 May 1987. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 25 Schooner Avenue, Snells Beach, Snells Beach, 0920 (type: registered, physical). 19 Cornelian Crescent, Half Moon Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, until 05 Nov 2020. 2000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Beadle, Kenneth Edward (an individual) located at Snells Beach, Snells Beach postcode 0920. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 1000 shares); it includes
Beadle, Maria (an individual) - located at Snells Beach, Snells Beach. Businesscheck's database was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25 Schooner Avenue, Snells Beach, Snells Beach, 0920 | Registered & physical & service | 05 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kenneth Edward Beadle
Snells Beach, Snells Beach, 0920
Address used since 28 Oct 2020
Half Moon Bay, Manukau, 2012
Address used since 17 Feb 2010 |
Director | 06 May 1987 - current |
Maria Beadle
Half Moon Bay, Manukau, 2012
Address used since 17 Feb 2010 |
Director | 25 Jan 1993 - 08 Dec 2015 |
Leonard Walter Nolloth
Campbells Bay,
Address used since 03 Apr 1987 |
Director | 03 Apr 1987 - 25 Jan 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
19 Cornelian Crescent, Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 | Registered & physical | 27 Feb 2020 - 05 Nov 2020 |
127 Charles Prevost Drive, The Gardens, Auckland, 2105 | Registered & physical | 01 Mar 2011 - 27 Feb 2020 |
127 Charles Prevost Drive, The Gardens, Manukau 2105 | Physical & registered | 02 Nov 2009 - 01 Mar 2011 |
1 Garfield Street, Parnell, Auckland 1052 | Registered & physical | 30 Mar 2007 - 02 Nov 2009 |
81 Remuera Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 27 Feb 2007 - 30 Mar 2007 |
52 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 03 Aug 1998 - 03 Aug 1998 |
52 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered | 03 Aug 1998 - 27 Feb 2007 |
Parker Murray & Co, 81 Remuera Road, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 03 Aug 1998 - 27 Feb 2007 |
352 Church Street, Penrose, Auckland | Registered | 16 Apr 1996 - 03 Aug 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Beadle, Kenneth Edward Individual |
Snells Beach Snells Beach 0920 |
06 May 1987 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Beadle, Maria Individual |
Snells Beach Snells Beach 0920 |
06 May 1987 - current |
Brampton Trustee Co Limited 127 Charles Prevost Drive |
|
Swaris & Associates Limited 127 Charles Prevost Drive |
|
Sarah Lee Properties Limited 127 Charles Prevost Drive |
|
Isola Racing Stables Limited 127 Charles Prevost Drive |
|
Swaris Trustee Limited 127 Charles Prevost Drive |
|
Gcom Services Limited 127 Charles Prevost Drive |