Taylor Built Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429039662002) was registered on 19 Dec 1986. 8 addresess are currently in use by the company: 64 Omokoroa Road, Omokoroa, 3114 (type: registered, service). 47 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale had been their registered address, until 23 May 2024. 50000 shares are allotted to 12 shareholders who belong to 7 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 5 shares (0.01 per cent of shares), namely:
Taylor, Catherine Audrey (an individual) located at Omokoroa, Omokoroa postcode 3114. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 69.98 per cent of all shares (34990 shares); it includes
Taylor, Gregory David (an individual) - located at Omokoroa, Omokoroa,
Taylor, Catherine Audrey (an individual) - located at Omokoroa, Omokoroa. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (5 shares, 0.01%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Taylor, Gregory David, located at Omokoroa, Omokoroa (an individual). "Horticultural services nec" (ANZSIC A052963) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Taylor Built Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
47 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Shareregister & other (Address For Share Register) | 04 Apr 2018 |
47 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Physical | 12 Apr 2018 |
47 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Office & delivery | 02 Apr 2019 |
466, Silverdale, 0944 | Postal | 06 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gregory David Taylor
Omokoroa, Omokoroa, 3114
Address used since 07 Apr 2016 |
Director | 19 Dec 1986 - current |
Lindsay Cordonel Hamer
Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932
Address used since 01 Oct 2011 |
Director | 20 May 2003 - 12 Apr 2023 |
Catherine Audrey Taylor
R D 4, Albany,
Address used since 19 Dec 1986 |
Director | 19 Dec 1986 - 31 Mar 2010 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
466, Silverdale, 0944 | Postal | 06 Apr 2022 |
64 Omokoroa Road, Omokoroa, 3114 | Shareregister | 15 May 2024 |
64 Omokoroa Road, Omokoroa, 3114 | Registered & service | 23 May 2024 |
45 Forge Road , Silverdale , Silverdale , 0932 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
47 Forge Road, Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932 | Registered & service | 12 Apr 2018 - 23 May 2024 |
145 Kitchener Road, Milford, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & registered | 09 Nov 2009 - 12 Apr 2018 |
145 Kitchener Road, Milford | Registered & physical | 22 Apr 2005 - 09 Nov 2009 |
C/- Alan R Hall, Chartered Accounants, 221 Shakespeare Road, Takapuna 9 | Physical | 20 Apr 1998 - 22 Apr 2005 |
C /- Fish & Hall, 221 Shakespeare Road, Takapuna | Registered | 10 Jun 1997 - 22 Apr 2005 |
Jeffs Rd, Dairy Flat, R D 2, Albany | Registered | 03 Feb 1994 - 10 Jun 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taylor, Catherine Audrey Individual |
Omokoroa Omokoroa 3114 |
19 Dec 1986 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taylor, Gregory David Individual |
Omokoroa Omokoroa 3114 |
19 Dec 1986 - current |
Taylor, Catherine Audrey Individual |
Omokoroa Omokoroa 3114 |
19 Dec 1986 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Taylor, Gregory David Individual |
Omokoroa Omokoroa 3114 |
19 Dec 1986 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Huxford, Mervyn Paul Individual |
Rd4 Albany Auckland 0794 |
02 Nov 2009 - current |
Atkinson, Karen Denise Individual |
Rd4 Albany Auckland 0794 |
02 Nov 2009 - current |
Atkinson, Scott Peter William Individual |
Rd 4 Albany 0794 |
11 Aug 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hamer, Barbara Individual |
Stanmore Bay Auckland 0932 |
02 Nov 2009 - current |
Hamer, Lindsay Cordonel Individual |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 |
11 Aug 2004 - current |
Wallace, Craig Robert Individual |
Rd 3 Silverdale 0933 |
02 Nov 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hamer, Lindsay Cordonel Individual |
Stanmore Bay Auckland 0932 |
02 Nov 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Atkinson, Scott Peter William Individual |
Rd 4 Albany 0794 |
11 Aug 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hall, Alan Richard Individual |
Saint Marys Bay Auckland 1011 |
19 Dec 1986 - 04 Apr 2018 |
Greenhouse Systems Limited 47 Forge Road |
|
Reelenz (old) Limited 47 Forge Road |
|
Pacific Island Exports Limited 47 Forge Road |
|
Daniel Osbourne Investments Limited 50 Forge Road |
|
Osbourne Roberts Investments Limited 50 Forge Road |
|
Pyramid Engineering Limited 50 Forge Road |
Greenhouse Systems Limited 47 Forge Road |
Reelenz (old) Limited 47 Forge Road |
Sports Surface Design And Management Limited 64 Porana Road |
Buzz Pollination Limited 15 Raymond Terrace |
Westag Trading Limited 751 State Highway 16 |
Horticentre Limited 18 Cabernet Crescent |