Riverside Developments Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429039695680) was started on 12 Sep 1986. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 7 Parakawau Road, Ohau, Levin, 5510 (type: physical, registered). Main Road South, Ohau, Levin had been their physical address, up until 18 Feb 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 14 shares (14 per cent of shares), namely:
Lesley Goodwin (an individual) located at Fitzherbert, Palmerston North postcode 4410. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 43 per cent of all shares (43 shares); it includes
Peter Goodwin (an individual) - located at Levin. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (43 shares, 43%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Mark Williams, located at Otaki (an individual). "Bridge construction or repair" (ANZSIC E310130) is the classification the ABS issued Riverside Developments Limited. Our information was last updated on 14 Apr 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Gladstone Road, Levin | Other (Address For Share Register) | 31 Mar 2003 |
Main Road South, Ohau, Levin | Other (Address for Records) | 28 Feb 2006 |
7 Parakawau Road, Ohau, Levin, 5510 | Other (Address for Records) | 08 Feb 2019 |
7 Parakawau Road, Ohau, Levin, 5510 | Physical & registered | 18 Feb 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Mark Goodwin
Rd 1, Levin, 5571
Address used since 05 Feb 2021
Rd 1, Levin, 5571
Address used since 10 May 2010 |
Director | 29 Sep 1986 - current |
Mark Douglas Williams
Otaki, Otaki, 5512
Address used since 02 Feb 2015 |
Director | 02 Feb 2015 - current |
Lesley Ann Goodwin
Fitzherbert, Palmerston North, 4410
Address used since 02 Feb 2015 |
Director | 02 Feb 2015 - current |
Kimberley Paul Mccabe
Rd 8, Masterton,
Address used since 29 Sep 1986 |
Director | 29 Sep 1986 - 01 Feb 1994 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
7 Parakawau Road, Ohau, Levin, 5510 | Physical & registered | 18 Feb 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Main Road South, Ohau, Levin | Physical | 07 Mar 2006 - 18 Feb 2019 |
Main Road South, Ohau, Levin | Registered | 11 Mar 2002 - 18 Feb 2019 |
Main Road South, Ohua, Levin | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 01 Jul 1997 |
Riverside Farm, Tararua Road, Levin | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 01 Jul 1997 |
Mains Road South, Ohua, Levin | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 07 Mar 2006 |
Riverside Farm, Tararua Road, Levin | Registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 11 Mar 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lesley Ann Goodwin Individual |
Fitzherbert Palmerston North 4410 |
17 Mar 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter Mark Goodwin Individual |
Levin 5540 |
12 Sep 1986 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Douglas Williams Individual |
Otaki 5512 |
17 Mar 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Penelope Jill Goodwin Individual |
Levin |
12 Sep 1986 - 17 Mar 2015 |
Richard Webb Limited Main Road Sth |
|
Riverside Precast Limited Main Road South |
|
Good Life Estate Limited 154 Main Road South |
|
Geerling Cut Flowers Limited 1234 Main Road South |
|
Homestead Construction Limited 76 Main Road South |
|
Homestead Development Limited 76 Main Road South |
Edifice Contracts Limited 35-39 Tiro Tiro Rd |
Bailey Civil Limited 10 Wicksteed Street |
Quigley's Farm Bridges Limited 478 Wilton Collieries Road |
Jr Works Group Limited 3 Waingaro Lane |
Access Construction (2011) Limited 16 Marshall Street |
Canform Structures Limited 15 Pukeko Place |