Tatua Consulting Services Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429039741622) was started on 29 Apr 1986. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 5 Kipling Street, Waverley, Dunedin, 9013 (type: physical, service). 60 Tennyson Street, Dunedin had been their registered address, up until 16 Nov 2015. 185000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 3 entities and holds 166500 shares (90 per cent of shares), namely:
Practice Management Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Dunedin postcode 9016,
Baylis, Arthur William (an individual) located at Kelvin Heights, Queenstown postcode 9300,
Brown, Colleen Joy (an individual) located at Waverley, Dunedin postcode 9013. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10 per cent of all shares (18500 shares); it includes
Brown, Estate Of Randolph Ross (an individual) - located at Waverley, Dunedin. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 07 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Kipling Street, Waverley, Dunedin, 9013 | Physical & service & registered | 16 Nov 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Colleen Joy Brown
Waverley, Dunedin, 9013
Address used since 04 Dec 2009 |
Director | 07 Nov 1991 - current |
Randolph Ross Brown
Waverley, Dunedin, 9013
Address used since 04 Dec 2009 |
Director | 07 Nov 1991 - 01 Aug 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
60 Tennyson Street, Dunedin | Registered | 05 Mar 2001 - 16 Nov 2015 |
44 York Place, Dunedin | Registered | 05 Mar 2001 - 05 Mar 2001 |
Kpmg Peat Marwick, 44 York Place, Dunedin | Registered | 26 Nov 1997 - 05 Mar 2001 |
C/- K M P G Peat Marwick, 44 York Place, Dunedin | Physical | 19 Feb 1992 - 19 Feb 1992 |
44 York Place, Dunedin | Physical | 19 Feb 1992 - 19 Feb 1992 |
- | Physical | 19 Feb 1992 - 19 Feb 1992 |
60 Tennyson Street, Dunedin | Physical | 19 Feb 1992 - 16 Nov 2015 |
Peat Marwick Mitchell & Co, 31 Stafford Street, Dunedin | Registered | 04 Sep 1991 - 26 Nov 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Practice Management Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036941384 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Dunedin 9016 |
05 Jun 2009 - current |
Baylis, Arthur William Individual |
Kelvin Heights Queenstown 9300 |
05 Jun 2009 - current |
Brown, Colleen Joy Individual |
Waverley Dunedin 9013 |
05 Jun 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brown, Estate Of Randolph Ross Individual |
Waverley Dunedin 9013 |
05 Nov 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baylis, Arthur William Individual |
60 Tennyson Street Dunedin |
29 Apr 1986 - 05 Jun 2009 |
Baylis, Arthur William Individual |
60 Tennyson Street Dunedin |
29 Apr 1986 - 05 Jun 2009 |
Brown, Randolph Ross Individual |
Dunedin |
05 Jun 2009 - 05 Nov 2017 |
Brown, Colleen Joy Individual |
Dunedin |
29 Apr 1986 - 05 Jun 2009 |
Brown, Randalph Ross Individual |
Dunedin |
29 Apr 1986 - 05 Nov 2017 |
Practice Management Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036941384 Company Number: 1130783 Entity |
29 Apr 1986 - 05 Jun 2009 | |
Brown, Randolph Ross Individual |
60 Tennyson Street Dunedin |
29 Apr 1986 - 05 Jun 2009 |
Practice Management Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036941384 Company Number: 1130783 Entity |
29 Apr 1986 - 05 Jun 2009 |
Aotea Jones Group Limited 5 Kipling Street |
|
Harbo Holdings Limited 7 Kipling Street |
|
Qp Software Limited 92 Belford Street |
|
Qp Timetrax Limited 92 Belford Street |
|
Qp Limited 92 Belford Street |
|
Braeside Trust 62 Belford Street |