Midlothian Investments Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429039990358) was incorporated on 31 Oct 1983. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 8 Owens Road, Waiuku, Waiuku, 2123 (type: registered, physical). 33A Caulton Street, St Johns, Auckland had been their registered address, until 05 Aug 2022. 20 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 20 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
The Scottish and Northern Investment Company Limited (an entity) located at Waiuku, Auckland postcode 2123. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
8 Owens Road, Waiuku, Waiuku, 2123 | Registered & physical & service | 05 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Djarne Frith Mcquillan
Waiuku, Waiuku, 2123
Address used since 28 Jul 2022
Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 31 Jan 2022 |
Director | 31 Jan 2022 - current |
Dion Michael Murphy
St Johns, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 31 Jan 2022
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 14 Jul 2020
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 09 Jun 1992 |
Director | 09 Jun 1992 - 01 Feb 2022 |
Robert Hendry Luke
Meadowbank, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Jun 1992 |
Director | 09 Jun 1992 - 14 Oct 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
33a Caulton Street, St Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Registered & physical | 21 Feb 2022 - 05 Aug 2022 |
Suite 104, 10 Turua St, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 | Physical | 11 Jul 2018 - 21 Feb 2022 |
Suite 104, 10 Turua St, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 | Registered | 31 Aug 2017 - 21 Feb 2022 |
Level 2 27 Gillies Ave, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered | 11 Jul 2005 - 31 Aug 2017 |
Level 2 27 Gillies Ave, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical | 11 Jul 2005 - 11 Jul 2018 |
Level 9, Arthur Andersen Tower, 209 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 01 Aug 1996 - 11 Jul 2005 |
44 Anzac Avenue, Auckland | Registered | 01 Aug 1996 - 11 Jul 2005 |
Level One, Administrator House, 44 Anzac Avenue, Auckland 1 | Registered | 12 Dec 1991 - 01 Aug 1996 |
130 Main Highway, Ellerslie | Registered | 02 Aug 1991 - 12 Dec 1991 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Scottish And Northern Investment Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039998811 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Waiuku Auckland 2123 |
31 Oct 1983 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murphy, Dion Michael Individual |
Glendowie Auckland |
31 Oct 1983 - 09 Jun 2016 |
J & K Grocer Limited Suite 104, 10 Turua St |
|
Bexley Clinic Limited 10 Maheke Street |
|
Indian Taste (nz) Limited 3/429 Tamaki Drive |
|
Sm Global International Limited 409 Tamaki Drive |
|
Eden Wines NZ Limited 409 Tamaki Drive |
|
Eden Bistro & Bar Limited 409 Tamaki Drive |