Te Kauwhata Transport (2020) Limited (issued a business number of 9429039999542) was started on 31 Aug 1983. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 18 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga, 3900 (type: registered, physical). C/- Bailey Ingham, Maniopoto Street, Otorahonga had been their registered address, up until 14 Mar 2000. Te Kauwhata Transport (2020) Limited used more aliases, namely: Te Kauwhata Transport (2013) Limited from 21 Mar 2013 to 21 Mar 2013, Heathstock Haulage (2004) Limited (28 Oct 2004 to 21 Mar 2013) and Patetere Transport Limited (31 Aug 1983 - 28 Oct 2004). 100000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 100000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Bailey Ingham Trustees 2016 Limited (an entity) located at Otorohanga postcode 3900,
James Barker Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Otorohanga, Otorohanga postcode 3900. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
18 Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga, 3900 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Dec 2010 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter James Barker
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 19 Oct 2016
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 17 May 2019 |
Director | 21 Jan 2000 - current |
James Barker
115 Oceanbeach Road, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 30 Nov 2009 |
Director | 21 Jan 2000 - 28 Aug 2016 |
David Stewart Graham
R D 1, Putaruru,
Address used since 01 Jun 1999 |
Director | 01 Jun 1999 - 21 Jan 2000 |
Richard Campbell Johnstone
Matira, R D 2, Ngaruawhahia,
Address used since 01 Jun 1999 |
Director | 01 Jun 1999 - 21 Jan 2000 |
Philip Peter Jensen
Tauranga,
Address used since 20 Oct 1999 |
Director | 20 Oct 1999 - 21 Jan 2000 |
William John Samways
Tirau,
Address used since 03 Nov 1992 |
Director | 03 Nov 1992 - 01 Jun 1999 |
Rodney John Barrett
Tirau,
Address used since 03 Nov 1992 |
Director | 03 Nov 1992 - 01 Jun 1999 |
Ivan John Titter
Tirau,
Address used since 03 Nov 1992 |
Director | 03 Nov 1992 - 01 Jun 1999 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- Bailey Ingham, Maniopoto Street, Otorahonga | Registered | 14 Mar 2000 - 14 Mar 2000 |
Patetere Transport Limited, Bailey Ingham Limited, Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga | Physical | 14 Mar 2000 - 08 Dec 2010 |
Bailey Ingham Limited, Chartered Accountants, Maniapoto Street, Otorohanga | Registered | 14 Mar 2000 - 08 Dec 2010 |
C/- Bailey Ingham, Maniopoto Street, Otorahanga | Physical | 14 Mar 2000 - 14 Mar 2000 |
Matamata Road, Tirau | Physical | 21 Feb 2000 - 14 Mar 2000 |
Matamata Rd, Tirau | Registered | 21 Feb 2000 - 14 Mar 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bailey Ingham Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429043399314 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Otorohanga 3900 |
03 Nov 2016 - current |
James Barker Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429043406074 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Otorohanga Otorohanga 3900 |
03 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bailey, David Charles Individual |
Otorohanga Otorohanga 3974 |
31 Aug 1983 - 03 Nov 2016 |
Barker, James Individual |
Mount Maunganui |
31 Aug 1983 - 03 Nov 2016 |
Caiseal Trustee Company Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Love Your Business Hoogstra Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Catch Charters (2017) Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Freken Investments Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Hawk 2000 Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |
|
Height Access Limited 18 Maniapoto Street |