Gallagher Group Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429040076591) was launched on 01 Feb 1974. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 181 Kahikatea Drive, Melville, Hamilton, 3206 (type: registered, service). Gallagher Group Limited used other names, namely: Gallagher Electronics Limited from 01 Feb 1974 to 11 Nov 1992. 3959513 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 3959513 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Gallagher Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Melville, Hamilton postcode 3206. "Electrical equipment or machinery mfg nec" (business classification C243930) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Gallagher Group Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Kahikatea Drive, Hamilton | Registered & physical & service | 26 May 1997 |
181 Kahikatea Drive, Melville, Hamilton, 3206 | Postal & office | 23 Feb 2023 |
181 Kahikatea Drive, Melville, Hamilton, 3206 | Registered & service | 03 Mar 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
William Murray Gallagher
Hamilton Lake, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 01 Mar 2010 |
Director | 12 Aug 1991 - current |
Kahl Damian Betham
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 26 Mar 2019 |
Director | 26 Mar 2019 - current |
Marion Andeweg
Rd 4, Hamilton, 3284
Address used since 31 Oct 2022 |
Director | 31 Oct 2022 - current |
Simon Arend Graafhuis
Huntington, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 15 Mar 2022 |
Director | 15 Mar 2022 - 01 Nov 2022 |
John Allan Gallagher
120 Lake Road, Frankton, Hamilton 3204, 3204
Address used since 01 Feb 2016 |
Director | 12 Aug 1991 - 15 Mar 2022 |
Steven James Tucker
Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 01 Mar 2019
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 01 Mar 2010 |
Director | 20 Jul 2001 - 15 Mar 2022 |
Robert James Booth
Castor Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 04 Feb 1997 |
Director | 04 Feb 1997 - 20 Jul 2006 |
Bruce Craig Munro
Takapuna, Auckland,
Address used since 04 Feb 1997 |
Director | 04 Feb 1997 - 20 Jul 2006 |
Richard Sidney Janes
Thorndon, Wellington,
Address used since 28 Sep 2000 |
Director | 28 Sep 2000 - 20 Jul 2006 |
Paul Moore Hargreaves
Remuera, Auckland,
Address used since 28 Sep 2000 |
Director | 28 Sep 2000 - 20 Jul 2006 |
Richard Gordon Maxwell Christie
Roseneath, Wellington,
Address used since 18 Aug 1997 |
Director | 18 Aug 1997 - 09 Dec 1999 |
John Leonard Walley
Hamilton,
Address used since 16 Dec 1992 |
Director | 16 Dec 1992 - 25 Mar 1998 |
Stephen Leslie Aldridge
Hamilton,
Address used since 04 Feb 1997 |
Director | 04 Feb 1997 - 28 May 1997 |
David Ross Mullen
Killara, Sydney 2071, Australia,
Address used since 12 Aug 1991 |
Director | 12 Aug 1991 - 04 Feb 1997 |
Neil Andrew Richardson
Hamilton,
Address used since 12 Aug 1991 |
Director | 12 Aug 1991 - 30 Jan 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gallagher Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036630417 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Melville Hamilton 3206 |
01 Feb 1974 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Gallagher Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1187732 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Kahikatea Drive Hamilton |
Gallagher Holdings Limited Kahikatea Drive |
|
Cardax (international) Limited Kahikatea Drive |
|
Kahikatea Investments 2023 Limited Kahikatea Drive |
|
J. & G. Gallagher Management Limited Kahikatea Drive |
|
Gallagher Security (int) Limited Kahikatea Drive |
|
Durolla Products (nz) Limited Kahikatea Drive |
King Manufacturing (2004) Limited 52 Burwood Road |
Plc Power Limited 18 St Stephens Avenue |
Carbon Technologies Limited 27a Norman Spencer Drive |
Exide Technologies Limited 6h Percival Gull Place |
Montrose Electrical Limited Suite 3, 739 Chapel Road |
Leco Switchgear Hamilton Limited 3b Delta Avenue |