Ngaruroro Farm Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040222134) was registered on 26 Jun 1970. 1 address is in use by the company: 5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 (type: physical, registered). Cnr Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings had been their physical address, until 08 Dec 2017. 5000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.02 per cent of shares), namely:
Sarah Glazebrook (an individual) located at Ruby Bay, Mapua, Nelson 7005. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 99.98 per cent of all shares (exactly 4999 shares); it includes
Sarah Glazebrook (an individual) - located at Ruby Bay, Mapua, Nelson 7005,
William Glazebrook (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Hastings. Businesscheck's data was updated on 20 Feb 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 | Physical & registered | 08 Dec 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarah Esme Glazebrook
Ruby Bay Mapua, Nelson, 7005
Address used since 23 Feb 2008 |
Director | 28 Oct 2003 - current |
Arthur Derek Glazebrook
Havelock North,
Address used since 16 Oct 1991 |
Director | 16 Oct 1991 - 28 Oct 2003 |
William Alexander Glazebrook
Rd 1, Hastings,
Address used since 16 Oct 1991 |
Director | 16 Oct 1991 - 28 Oct 2003 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Cnr Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings | Physical & registered | 04 Aug 2004 - 08 Dec 2017 |
Barnes Kirk & Ass, Chartered, Accountants, Cnr Eastbourne & Market, Streets, Hastings | Registered | 03 Sep 2001 - 04 Aug 2004 |
Barnes Kirk & Ass, Chartered, Accountants, Cnr Eastbourne & Market, Streets, Hastings | Physical | 01 Apr 1998 - 01 Apr 1998 |
Barnes Kirk & Associates, Chartered Accountants, 202-204n Warren Street, Hastings | Registered | 01 Apr 1998 - 03 Sep 2001 |
- | Physical | 01 Apr 1998 - 01 Apr 1998 |
Barnes Kirk Ltd, Chartered Accountants, Cnr Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings | Physical | 01 Apr 1998 - 04 Aug 2004 |
Barnes Kirk, Chartered Accountants, Cnr, Eastbourne & Market Streets, Hastings | Physical | 01 Apr 1998 - 01 Apr 1998 |
C/- Coopers & Lybrand, Chartered Accountants, 202-204n Warren Street, Hastings | Registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 01 Apr 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarah Esme Glazebrook Individual |
Ruby Bay Mapua, Nelson 7005 |
26 Jun 1970 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarah Esme Glazebrook Individual |
Ruby Bay Mapua, Nelson 7005 |
26 Jun 1970 - current |
William Alexander Glazebrook Individual |
Rd 1 Hastings |
26 Jun 1970 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dinah Helen Glazebrook Individual |
Havelock North |
26 Jun 1970 - 08 Sep 2016 |
Arthur Derek Glazebrook Individual |
Havelock North |
26 Jun 1970 - 22 Sep 2016 |
Mapua Coastal Village Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Bruce Investments Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
On Trak Trustee Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Dames Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Newtons Flat Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Wg & Je Chambers Limited 5 Havelock Road |