Orari Gorge Homestead Limited (NZBN 9429040336596) was incorporated on 13 Apr 1982. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 (type: physical, registered). 251 Stafford St, Timaru had been their registered address, up to 13 Jul 2011. 500 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 233 shares (46.6% of shares), namely:
Peacock, Robert Charles Howard (an individual) located at Rd 21, Geraldine postcode 7991. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 26.8% of all shares (134 shares); it includes
Peacock, Rosa Howard (an individual) - located at Rd 21, Geraldine. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (133 shares, 26.6%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Tripp, Edith Howard, located at St Albans, Christchurch (an individual). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 161 Burnett Street, Ashburton, 7700 | Physical & registered & service | 13 Jul 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Edith Howard Tripp
St Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 03 Dec 2023
St Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 08 Mar 2012 |
Director | 01 Jul 1991 - current |
Leonard Owen Howard Tripp
No 21 Rd, Geraldine, 7991
Address used since 28 Jul 2015 |
Director | 01 Jul 1991 - current |
Rosa Howard Peacock
No 21 Rd, Geraldine, 7991
Address used since 05 Jul 2011 |
Director | 01 Jul 1991 - current |
Margaret Helen Tripp
Dunedin,
Address used since 10 Jul 1992 |
Director | 10 Jul 1992 - 15 Dec 2006 |
Richard Howard Tripp
Governors Bay,
Address used since 01 Jul 1991 |
Director | 01 Jul 1991 - 05 Sep 2005 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
251 Stafford St, Timaru, 7940 | Registered | 23 Jun 2011 - 13 Jul 2011 |
251 Stafford St, Timaru | Registered | 01 Aug 2001 - 23 Jun 2011 |
215 Stafford St, Timaru | Registered & physical | 01 Aug 2001 - 01 Aug 2001 |
251 Stafford St, Timaru | Physical | 01 Aug 2001 - 13 Jul 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peacock, Robert Charles Howard Individual |
Rd 21 Geraldine 7991 |
30 Aug 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peacock, Rosa Howard Individual |
Rd 21 Geraldine 7991 |
13 Apr 1982 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tripp, Edith Howard Individual |
St Albans Christchurch 8014 |
13 Apr 1982 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tripp, Margaret Helen Individual |
Dunedin |
13 Apr 1982 - 30 Aug 2007 |
Tripp, Leonard Owen Howard Individual |
Rd 21 Geraldine 7991 |
13 Apr 1982 - 13 Feb 2017 |
Foster Dairying Limited Level 1 |
|
Sunlaws Trustee Company (rs) Limited Level 1 |
|
Sunlaws Trustee Company (as) Limited Level 1 |
|
Sunlaws Trustee Company (hs) Limited Level 1 |
|
Sunlaws Trustee Company (ps) Limited Level 1 |
|
Chisnall Ruapuna Limited Level 1 |