Cosmic Holdings Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040511078) was incorporated on 27 May 1974. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 22 Riddell Road, Glendowie, Auckland, 1071 (type: registered, service). 43 Temple St, Meadowbank, Auckland had been their physical address, until 23 Mar 2022. 160000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 30 shares (0.02% of shares), namely:
Wallis, Anthony Bruce (an individual) located at Gladesville, Sydney Nsw postcode 2111. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 99.98% of all shares (exactly 159960 shares); it includes
Flexgrip International Limited (an entity) - located at Glendowie, Auckland. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (10 shares, 0.01%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Wallis, John Gregory, located at Remuera, Auckland (an individual). Businesscheck's information was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
66a Bay Road, Glendowie, Auckland, 1071 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Mar 2022 |
22 Riddell Road, Glendowie, Auckland, 1071 | Registered & service | 08 Aug 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Gregory Wallis
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 15 Mar 2022
Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 01 Sep 2020
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 21 Mar 1988 |
Director | 21 Mar 1988 - current |
Raymond Ernest Wallis
Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 21 Mar 1988 |
Director | 21 Mar 1988 - 05 Oct 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
43 Temple St, Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072 | Physical & registered | 22 Sep 2020 - 23 Mar 2022 |
18 Lochiel Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Physical & registered | 20 Dec 2005 - 22 Sep 2020 |
359 Onehunga Mall, Onehunga, Auckland | Physical & registered | 06 Jun 1997 - 20 Dec 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wallis, Anthony Bruce Individual |
Gladesville Sydney Nsw 2111 |
04 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Flexgrip International Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040972954 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Glendowie Auckland 1071 |
27 May 1974 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wallis, John Gregory Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
27 May 1974 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wallis, Raymond Ernest Individual |
Meadowbank Auckland |
27 May 1974 - 04 Apr 2022 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Flexgrip International Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1638 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
43 Temple St Meadowbank Auckland 1072 |
Lochiel Trustee Limited 14 Lochiel Road |
|
Grafton Ny Services Limited 24 Lochiel Road |
|
Lochiel Enterprises Limited 12 Lochiel Road |
|
Lmw Trustees Limited 17 Wairua Road |
|
Premier Distributors Of New Zealand Limited 17 Lochiel Road |
|
Hume Industries Limited 28 Lochiel Road |