Majestic Textiles Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040551074) was incorporated on 10 Nov 1972. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 3 Bancroft Crescent, Glendene, Auckland, 0602 (type: registered, physical). 3 Bancroft Crescent, Glendene, Auckland 7 had been their physical address, up until 20 Apr 2020. Majestic Textiles Limited used other aliases, namely: Majestic Rug Company Limited from 10 Nov 1972 to 17 Apr 1986. 1950000 shares are issued to 8 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 487500 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
Mustard, Brock Robert Graham (an individual) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (exactly 487500 shares); it includes
Muri Capital Investments Limited (an entity) - located at Rd 2, Kaukapakapa. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allocation (243750 shares, 12.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Van Hest, Helen Louise, located at Parnell, Auckland (an individual). "Manufacturing nec" (ANZSIC C259907) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Majestic Textiles Limited. Our data was updated on 26 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
3 Bancroft Crescent, Glendene, Auckland, 0602 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Apr 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brock Robert Graham Mustard
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 21 Apr 2020 |
Director | 01 Apr 2020 - current |
Andrew James Mckenzie
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 30 Mar 2021 |
Director | 30 Mar 2021 - current |
Helen Louise Van Hest
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 22 Feb 2022 |
Director | 22 Feb 2022 - current |
Paul James Agnew
Rd 2, Kaukapakapa, 0875
Address used since 01 Dec 2023 |
Director | 01 Dec 2023 - current |
John Peter Van Hest
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 27 Jan 2010 |
Director | 28 Nov 1988 - 01 Dec 2023 |
Tracey Lancelot Goodin
Northpark, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 01 Sep 2018 |
Director | 01 Sep 2018 - 18 Jun 2020 |
Helen Louise Van Hest
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 01 Sep 2018 |
Director | 01 Sep 2018 - 01 Apr 2020 |
Mohammed Ali Fayiz Moheed
St Heliers, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Nov 1988 |
Director | 01 Nov 1988 - 31 Mar 2003 |
Stephen Mccarthy
Grey Lynn, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Oct 1995 |
Director | 01 Oct 1995 - 08 Oct 2001 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Bancroft Crescent, Glendene, Auckland 7 | Physical & registered | 28 May 1997 - 20 Apr 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mustard, Brock Robert Graham Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
08 Apr 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Muri Capital Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047660410 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 2 Kaukapakapa 0875 |
24 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Hest, Helen Louise Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
30 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Hest, John Peter Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
30 Nov 2020 - current |
Van Hest, Helen Louise Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
30 Nov 2020 - current |
Van Hest, John Peter Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
30 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Hest, John Peter Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
30 Nov 2020 - current |
Van Hest, John Peter Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
30 Nov 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mustard, David Gordon Charles Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
08 Apr 2020 - 24 Jun 2024 |
Mustard, David Gordon Charles Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
08 Apr 2020 - 24 Jun 2024 |
B2 Mustard Trust Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041130377 Company Number: 5025400 Entity |
Newmarket Auckland 1023 |
08 Apr 2020 - 24 Jun 2024 |
Trydan Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041146033 Company Number: 5054181 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 30 Nov 2020 | |
Rubbertree Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046944337 Company Number: 6922595 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 30 Nov 2020 | |
Majestic Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035036258 Company Number: 1586158 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 30 Nov 2020 | |
Trydan Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041146033 Company Number: 5054181 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Rubbertree Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046944337 Company Number: 6922595 Entity |
08 Apr 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Van Hest, John Peter Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
29 Jan 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Van Hest John, Peter Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland |
29 Jan 2004 - 29 Jan 2004 |
Rubbertree Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046944337 Company Number: 6922595 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Majestic Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035036258 Company Number: 1586158 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Trydan Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041146033 Company Number: 5054181 Entity |
20 Nov 2018 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Majestic Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035036258 Company Number: 1586158 Entity |
Glendene Auckland 7 |
04 Dec 2006 - 28 Aug 2020 |
Trydan Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041146033 Company Number: 5054181 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Rubbertree Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046944337 Company Number: 6922595 Entity |
Avondale Auckland 1026 |
08 Apr 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 |
Moheed, Mohammed Ali Fayiz Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 5 |
29 Jan 2004 - 29 Jan 2004 |
Rubbertree Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046944337 Company Number: 6922595 Entity |
Avondale Auckland 1026 |
28 Aug 2020 - 30 Nov 2020 |
Trydan Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041146033 Company Number: 5054181 Entity |
Northpark, Howick Auckland 2013 |
28 Aug 2020 - 30 Nov 2020 |
Majestic Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035036258 Company Number: 1586158 Entity |
Glendene Auckland 7 |
28 Aug 2020 - 30 Nov 2020 |
Rubbertree Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046944337 Company Number: 6922595 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Majestic Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035036258 Company Number: 1586158 Entity |
28 Aug 2020 - 28 Aug 2020 | |
Trydan Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041146033 Company Number: 5054181 Entity |
Northpark, Howick Auckland 2013 |
20 Nov 2018 - 28 Aug 2020 |
Majestic Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035036258 Company Number: 1586158 Entity |
Glendene Auckland 7 |
04 Dec 2006 - 28 Aug 2020 |
Majestic Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035036258 Company Number: 1586158 Entity |
Glendene Auckland 7 |
04 Dec 2006 - 28 Aug 2020 |
Van Hest, Adriane Individual |
Greenhithe |
29 Jan 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Van Hest, Kim Louise Individual |
Greenhithe Auckland |
29 Jan 2004 - 29 Jan 2004 |
Won 4 One 1/26 Bancroft Crescent |
|
The Bm Shop Limited Unit1/2a Akatea Road |
|
Bins Online Limited 6 Bancroft Crescent |
|
Metro Mini Bins Limited 6 Bancroft Crescent |
|
Freeth And Sons Limited 6 Bancroft Crescent |
Wisechoice NZ Limited 16 Culperry Road |
Pristine Biologicals (nz) Limited 12 Temuri Place |
Turbo Traders Limited 659 Rosebank Road |
Thos Holdsworth & Sons Limited 386 Rosebank Rd |
Princess Natural Bedding Limited Level 2, 703 Rosebank Road |
Icon Robotics Limited 455 Rosebank Road |