Anchor Wire Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429040568829) was started on 06 Jan 1972. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 6, 130 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland (type: physical, service). C/O Marley Loft Ltd, Level 6, 130 Broadway, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 26 Mar 2004. Anchor Wire Limited used other names, namely: Anchor Fence Limited from 06 Jan 1972 to 09 Dec 1992. 630000 shares are issued to 9 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 22038 shares (3.5% of shares), namely:
Russell, Wilson (a director) located at Campbells Bay, Auckland postcode 0620,
Russell Trustees No.1 Limited (an entity) located at Kingsland, Auckland postcode 1024,
Russell, Cameron (a director) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 85.07% of all shares (535924 shares); it includes
Russell, Wilson (a director) - located at Campbells Bay, Auckland,
Russell, Cameron (a director) - located at St Heliers, Auckland,
Russell Trustees No.1 Limited (an entity) - located at Kingsland, Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (50000 shares, 7.94%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Russell, Wilson, located at Campbells Bay, Auckland (a director),
Russell Trustees No.1 Limited, located at Kingsland, Auckland (an entity),
Russell, Cameron, located at St Heliers, Auckland (a director). Our database was last updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
131 Kerrs Road, Manukau, Auckland | Registered | 15 Jan 1996 |
Level 6, 130 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Physical & service | 26 Mar 2004 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Cameron Russell
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 19 Sep 2014 |
Director | 26 Aug 2008 - current |
Wilson Russell
Campbells Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 21 Jan 2021
38 Kitchener Road, Milford, North Shore City, 0620
Address used since 25 Mar 2010 |
Director | 26 Aug 2008 - current |
Diane Elizabeth Allen Russell
Northcote Point, North Shore City, 0627
Address used since 19 Mar 2015
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 23 Oct 2019 |
Director | 20 Jun 1995 - 22 Dec 2020 |
Shaun Russell
Rd 4, Pukekohe, 2679
Address used since 31 May 2013 |
Director | 31 May 2013 - 19 Apr 2017 |
Lynton Clark Russell
Northcote Point, North Shore City, 0627
Address used since 25 Mar 2010 |
Director | 14 Mar 1990 - 31 Mar 2013 |
Shaun Russell
Rd 4, Pukekohe, 2679
Address used since 25 Mar 2010 |
Director | 26 Aug 2008 - 05 May 2010 |
Graham Stuart Ronald Macdonald
Howick,
Address used since 14 Mar 1990 |
Director | 14 Mar 1990 - 20 Jun 1995 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/o Marley Loft Ltd, Level 6, 130 Broadway, Auckland | Physical | 12 May 2000 - 26 Mar 2004 |
C/-427a Mt Eden Road, Mt Eden, Auckland | Physical | 12 May 2000 - 12 May 2000 |
427a Mt Eden Road, Mt Eden, Auckland 1003 | Physical | 02 Apr 1998 - 12 May 2000 |
43 Ben Lomond Cres, Pakuranga, Auckland | Registered | 15 Jan 1996 - 15 Jan 1996 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Wilson Director |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0620 |
07 Mar 2019 - current |
Russell Trustees No.1 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032706772 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kingsland Auckland 1024 |
12 Aug 2013 - current |
Russell, Cameron Director |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
30 Oct 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Wilson Director |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0620 |
07 Mar 2019 - current |
Russell, Cameron Director |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
30 Oct 2017 - current |
Russell Trustees No.1 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032706772 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kingsland Auckland 1024 |
12 Aug 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Wilson Director |
Campbells Bay Auckland 0620 |
07 Mar 2019 - current |
Russell Trustees No.1 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032706772 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kingsland Auckland 1024 |
12 Aug 2013 - current |
Russell, Cameron Director |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
30 Oct 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Russell, Lynton Clark Individual |
Northcote |
04 Nov 2008 - 12 Aug 2013 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
04 Nov 2008 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
Northcote |
04 Nov 2008 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
06 Jan 1972 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Jalfon, Maurice Alwyn Individual |
Northcote North Shore City |
04 Nov 2008 - 07 Mar 2019 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
06 Jan 1972 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
04 Nov 2008 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
Northcote |
04 Nov 2008 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
04 Nov 2008 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Jalfon, Maurice Alwyn Individual |
Northcote North Shore City |
04 Nov 2008 - 07 Mar 2019 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
Northcote |
04 Nov 2008 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
Northcote |
04 Nov 2008 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
06 Jan 1972 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Jalfon, Maurice Alwyn Individual |
Northcote North Shore City |
04 Nov 2008 - 07 Mar 2019 |
Null - L&d Russell Trustees-russell Familytrust Other |
06 Jan 1972 - 04 Nov 2008 | |
Null - D E A Russell Family Trust Other |
06 Jan 1972 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Null - L C Russell Family Trust Other |
06 Jan 1972 - 04 Nov 2008 | |
Jalfon, Maurice Alwyn Individual |
Northcote North Shore City |
04 Nov 2008 - 07 Mar 2019 |
Russell, Diane Elizabeth Allen Individual |
Northcote Auckland |
06 Jan 1972 - 10 Feb 2020 |
Jalfon, Maurice Alwyn Individual |
Northcote North Shore City |
04 Nov 2008 - 07 Mar 2019 |
Jalfon, Maurice Alwyn Individual |
Northcote North Shore City |
04 Nov 2008 - 07 Mar 2019 |
L&d Russell Trustees-russell Familytrust Other |
06 Jan 1972 - 04 Nov 2008 | |
D E A Russell Family Trust Other |
06 Jan 1972 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
L C Russell Family Trust Other |
06 Jan 1972 - 04 Nov 2008 | |
Russell, Lynton Clark Individual |
Northcote |
06 Jan 1972 - 12 Aug 2013 |
Wadsworth, George Tinsley Individual |
Northcote North Shore City |
04 Nov 2008 - 12 Aug 2013 |
Arnott's New Zealand Limited Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent |
|
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Your Property Services Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Grovers Investments Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |