Dundrennan Holdings Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429040573120) was registered on 18 Aug 1971. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 7 Seaview Terrace, Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 (type: physical, registered). 11 Seaview Terrace, Mount Albert, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 13 Apr 2018. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Horsley, Ian Maitland (an individual) located at Mount Albert, Auckland postcode 1025. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Horsley, Graeme Bramwell (an individual) - located at Witherlea, Blenheim. "Holding company operation - passive investment in subsidiary companies" (ANZSIC K624030) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Dundrennan Holdings Limited. Our data was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
7 Seaview Terrace, Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 | Physical & registered & service | 13 Apr 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Graeme Bramwell Horsley
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 11 Sep 2009
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 05 Apr 2018 |
Director | 20 Sep 1989 - current |
Ian Maitland Horsley
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 05 Apr 2018
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 11 Sep 2009 |
Director | 20 Sep 1989 - current |
Christopher Hugh James Horsley
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 11 Sep 2009 |
Director | 20 Sep 1989 - 05 Apr 2018 |
Stephen Roy Horsley
Rd 3, Wellsford, 0973
Address used since 11 Sep 2009 |
Director | 20 Sep 1989 - 05 Apr 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
11 Seaview Terrace, Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025 | Registered & physical | 18 Sep 2009 - 13 Apr 2018 |
17 Norana Avenue, Remuera, Auckland 1005 | Registered | 19 Sep 2001 - 18 Sep 2009 |
17 Norana Avenue, Remuera, Auckland 1005 | Physical | 15 Sep 2001 - 15 Sep 2001 |
11 Seaview Terrace, Mt Albert, Auckland | Physical | 15 Sep 2001 - 18 Sep 2009 |
1 View Rd, Campbells Bay, Auckland 10 | Physical | 15 Sep 2000 - 15 Sep 2001 |
1 View Rd, Campbells Bay, Auckland 10 | Registered | 15 Sep 2000 - 19 Sep 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horsley, Ian Maitland Individual |
Mount Albert Auckland 1025 |
18 Aug 1971 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horsley, Graeme Bramwell Individual |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
18 Aug 1971 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Horsley, Christopher Hugh James Individual |
Mt Albert Auckland 1025 |
18 Aug 1971 - 05 Apr 2018 |
Horsley, Stephen Roy Individual |
Rd3 Wellsford 0973 |
18 Aug 1971 - 05 Apr 2018 |
Crown Design & Build Limited 7a Seaview Terrace |
|
Kastle Limited 7a Seaview Terrace |
|
Qmc Limited Flat 3, 10 Seaview Terrace |
|
Cillashaft Limited 1 Seaview Terrace |
|
Research & Development Management Proprietary Limited 3 Braemar Terrace |
|
Chameleon Television Productions Limited 9 Braemar Terrace |
Everon Holding Limited 1574 Great North Road |
Ballymena Limited 20 Seaside Avenue |
Powell Junior Limited Flat 2, 35 Powell Street |
Wen Trustee Services Limited 106 Taumata Road |
Reid Limited 90 Huia Road |
Obersalzberg Trustee Limited Flat 2, 103 Walker Road |