Nikau Bros Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429040594132) was incorporated on 13 May 1970. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 64 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 (type: registered, physical). 17 Hall Street, Pukekohe had been their physical address, until 17 Dec 2007. 1200 shares are issued to 8 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 5 shares (0.42 per cent of shares), namely:
Woodward, Felicity Anne (an individual) located at Tuakau. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.42 per cent of all shares (exactly 5 shares); it includes
Woodward, Phillip Cedric (an individual) - located at Tuakau. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (595 shares, 49.58%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Thecla Johnstone and Associates Trustee Limited, located at Rd2, Pukekohe (an entity),
Woodward, Philip Cedric, located at Tuakau (an individual),
Woodward, Felicity Anne, located at Tuakau (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
64 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 | Service & physical | 17 Dec 2007 |
64 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 | Registered | 18 Dec 2007 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Felicity Anne Woodward
Waikaretu, Tuakau, 2695
Address used since 03 Mar 2016 |
Director | 27 Jan 1982 - current |
Phillip Cedric Woodward
Waikaretu, Tuakau, 2695
Address used since 03 Mar 2016 |
Director | 27 Jan 1982 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
17 Hall Street, Pukekohe | Physical | 25 Jun 1997 - 17 Dec 2007 |
C/o Campbell Tyson, 17 Hall St, Pukekohe | Registered | 25 Jun 1997 - 18 Dec 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woodward, Felicity Anne Individual |
Tuakau |
13 May 1970 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woodward, Phillip Cedric Individual |
Tuakau |
13 May 1970 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Thecla Johnstone And Associates Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033523460 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd2 Pukekohe |
03 Apr 2008 - current |
Woodward, Philip Cedric Individual |
Tuakau |
22 Mar 2004 - current |
Woodward, Felicity Anne Individual |
Tuakau |
22 Mar 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Woodward, Philip Cedric Individual |
Tuakau |
22 Mar 2004 - current |
Woodward, Felicity Anne Individual |
Tuakau |
22 Mar 2004 - current |
Thecla Johnstone And Associates Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033523460 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd2 Pukekohe |
03 Apr 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Franklin Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039119612 Company Number: 503767 Entity |
22 Mar 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Franklin Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039119612 Company Number: 503767 Entity |
22 Mar 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Franklin Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039119612 Company Number: 503767 Entity |
22 Mar 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Alto Capital Investments 3 Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Franklin Party Hire 2013 Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
D M Roose Investments Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
D M Roose Corporate Trustee Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Changing Jobs Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Sema Limited 64 Beaver Road |