Edith Mcanulty Jewellers Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429040615073) was registered on 27 Nov 1968. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 33B Manse Road, Pahurehure, Papakura, 2113 (type: physical, registered). 25A Montgomery Avenue, Rothesay Bay, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 07 Oct 2015. 222000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 110000 shares (49.55% of shares), namely:
Mcanulty, Kelvin Edward Peter (an individual) located at Papakura. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.45% of all shares (exactly 1000 shares); it includes
Mcanulty, Kelvin Edward Peter (an individual) - located at Papakura. The Businesscheck database was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
33b Manse Road, Pahurehure, Papakura, 2113 | Physical & registered & service | 07 Oct 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kelvin Edwards Peter Mcanulty
Papakura, Auckland, 2113
Address used since 29 Sep 2015 |
Director | 30 Mar 2006 - current |
Edith Mary Manson Mcanulty
142 Shakespear Rd Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 06 Sep 2016 |
Director | 24 Sep 1988 - 29 Aug 2018 |
Leo Edward Mcanulty
Rothesay Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 24 Sep 1988 |
Director | 24 Sep 1988 - 30 Mar 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
25a Montgomery Avenue, Rothesay Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical & registered | 27 Sep 2005 - 07 Oct 2015 |
1st Flr, Amp Bldg, Cnr Wood & East Sts, Papakura | Registered | 13 Aug 2000 - 27 Sep 2005 |
Robertson Bixey & Associates, Cnr Wood & East Streets, Papakura | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 27 Sep 2005 |
1st Flr, Amp Bldg, Cnr Wood & East Sts, Papakura | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 01 Jul 1997 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcanulty, Kelvin Edward Peter Individual |
Papakura |
03 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcanulty, Kelvin Edward Peter Individual |
Papakura |
03 Apr 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moore, Gloria Janet Individual |
Mirangi Bay Auckland 0622 |
03 Apr 2006 - 03 Apr 2006 |
Moore, Gloria Janet Individual |
Mirangi Bay Auckland 0622 |
03 Apr 2006 - 03 Apr 2006 |
Mcanulty, Edith Mary Manson Individual |
Takapuna Auckland 0622 |
27 Nov 1968 - 23 Sep 2020 |
Moore, Gloria Janet Individual |
Browns Bay |
03 Apr 2006 - 03 Apr 2006 |
Mcanulty, Leo Edward Individual |
Rothesay Bay Auckland |
27 Nov 1968 - 03 Apr 2006 |
K A Mcanulty Consulting Limited 33b Manse Road |
|
New Zealand Alliance Educational Trust Board 33b Manse Road |
|
Marston Limited 39 Manse Road |
|
S & D Holdings Limited 40 Clark Road |
|
Crombach Huizen And Fitch Limited 40 Clark Road |
|
Mcanulty Builders Limited 50 Clark Road |