Nile Investments Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429040667539) was started on 01 Oct 1963. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 5/36 William Pickering Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, physical). 112 Bush Road, Rosedale, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 08 May 2017. 40000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 13333 shares (33.33% of shares), namely:
Kendall, Steven John (an individual) located at Awana Valley, Great Barrier Island (Aotea Island) postcode 0991. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33% of all shares (13333 shares); it includes
Kendall, Toni (an individual) - located at Great Barrier Island (Aotea Island). Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (13334 shares, 33.34%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Griffin, Deborah Mary, located at Rd 4, Dairy Flat (an individual). "Rental of commercial property" (ANZSIC L671250) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Nile Investments Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5/36 William Pickering Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 08 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Deborah Mary Griffin
Rd 4, Dairy Flat, 0794
Address used since 08 Feb 2024
Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932
Address used since 20 Feb 2018
Waiake, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 03 Feb 2016 |
Director | 23 Oct 1997 - current |
Steven John Kendall
Great Barrier Island (aotea Island), Great Barrier Island, 0991
Address used since 03 Feb 2016 |
Director | 10 Aug 1999 - current |
Robin Fraser Gardiner
Whangaparaoa,
Address used since 29 Jan 1991 |
Director | 29 Jan 1991 - 22 Jun 2000 |
Laurence Trevor Kendall
Torbay, Auckland,
Address used since 04 Feb 1991 |
Director | 04 Feb 1991 - 19 Jul 1999 |
Bernice Eileen Kendall
Torbay 10,
Address used since 04 Feb 1991 |
Director | 04 Feb 1991 - 06 Sep 1996 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
112 Bush Road, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical | 28 Nov 2012 - 08 May 2017 |
C/-nobilo & Co Ltd. Chartered Accountant, 5/36 William Pickering Drive, Albany, Auckland | Physical & registered | 19 Jun 2007 - 28 Nov 2012 |
5b Sharron Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Registered | 28 Feb 2000 - 19 Jun 2007 |
5b Sharron Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Physical | 25 Feb 2000 - 25 Feb 2000 |
Unit 2/5 Sharon Road, Browns Bay, Auckland | Physical | 25 Feb 2000 - 19 Jun 2007 |
22 Waiake Street, Torbay, Auckland | Physical | 09 Aug 1999 - 25 Feb 2000 |
22 Waiake Street, Torbay, Auckland 10 | Registered | 09 Aug 1999 - 28 Feb 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kendall, Steven John Individual |
Awana Valley Great Barrier Island (aotea Island) 0991 |
01 Oct 1963 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kendall, Toni Individual |
Great Barrier Island (aotea Island) 0991 |
04 Feb 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Griffin, Deborah Mary Individual |
Rd 4 Dairy Flat 0794 |
01 Oct 1963 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kendall, Roger Individual |
Stanmore Bay Whangaparaoa 0932 |
01 Oct 1963 - 04 Feb 2020 |
Nesti Trustees Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Dwellings Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Precision Plumbing Auckland Limited Unit 5, 36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Precision Plumbing North Shore Limited Unit 5, 36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Utility Mapping Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
|
Nesti Chartered Accountants Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
Arrow House Limited 5/36 William Pickering Drive |
Kingway Corporation Limited Unit 15, 13 Lovell Court |
Lucky Round Limited 7 Tarndale Grove |
Sino-nz Investment Limited 21 Oak Manor Drive |
Dhp Fashion Limited 47 Oak Manor Drive |
H A F Investments Limited 9 Tarndale Grove |