Kaitaia Traders Limited (NZBN 9429040672083) was launched on 27 Feb 1963. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 6 Redan Road, Kaitaia, Kaitaia, 0410 (type: physical, registered). C/- Bray Cormack & Dow, 6 Redan Road, Kaitaia had been their physical address, up to 13 Oct 2011. 3000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 1500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Cormack, Murray Donaldson (an individual) located at Rd 3, Kerikeri postcode 0293,
Cormack, Gloria Ann (an individual) located at Rd 3, Kerikeri postcode 0293. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (1500 shares); it includes
Bray, Warwick George (an individual) - located at Hillsborough, Auckland. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
6 Redan Road, Kaitaia, Kaitaia, 0410 | Physical & registered & service | 13 Oct 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Warwick George Bray
Hillsborough, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 05 Oct 2012 |
Director | 14 Sep 2007 - current |
Murray Donaldson Cormack
Rd 3, Kerikeri, 0293
Address used since 01 Oct 2020
Rd 1, Kaitaia, 0481
Address used since 01 Oct 2015 |
Director | 18 Feb 2008 - current |
Gloria Ann Cormack
Herekino,
Address used since 01 Nov 1991 |
Director | 01 Nov 1991 - 18 Feb 2008 |
Margaret Agnes Bray
R D 3, Kaitaia,
Address used since 01 Nov 1991 |
Director | 01 Nov 1991 - 14 Sep 2007 |
June M Smith
Kaitaia,
Address used since 01 Nov 1991 |
Director | 01 Nov 1991 - 20 Sep 1995 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/- Bray Cormack & Dow, 6 Redan Road, Kaitaia | Physical | 02 Nov 1999 - 13 Oct 2011 |
Redan Rd, Kaitaia | Physical | 02 Nov 1999 - 02 Nov 1999 |
Redan Rd, Kaitaia | Registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 13 Oct 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cormack, Murray Donaldson Individual |
Rd 3 Kerikeri 0293 |
30 Nov 2006 - current |
Cormack, Gloria Ann Individual |
Rd 3 Kerikeri 0293 |
27 Feb 1963 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bray, Warwick George Individual |
Hillsborough Auckland 1042 |
08 Oct 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bray, Margaret Agnes Individual |
R D 3 Kaitaia |
27 Feb 1963 - 30 Nov 2006 |
C R Thompson Limited 6 Redan Road |
|
NZ Surf Bros Limited 6 Redan Road |
|
Clover Consultancy Limited 6 Redan Road |
|
35 Degrees South Aotearoa Limited 6 Redan Road |
|
Unique Gas & Plumbing Limited 6 Redan Road |
|
Tiaki Consulting Limited 6 Redan Road |