Motor Truck Distributors (Nz) Limited (issued a business number of 9429040785011) was incorporated on 22 Dec 1980. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 29 Malden St, Palmerston North (type: registered, physical). Motor Truck Distributors (Nz) Limited used more aliases, namely: Truck Investments Limited from 13 Jul 1984 to 04 Feb 1985, Attention Transport One Limited (22 Dec 1980 to 13 Jul 1984). 3500000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 3500000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Sime Darby Commercial (Nz) Limited (an entity) located at Palmerston North. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Malden St, Palmerston North | Registered | 07 May 1997 |
29 Malden Street, Palmerston North | Physical & service | 07 May 1997 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Patrick Francis Mckenna
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Feb 2007 |
Director | 13 Apr 2006 - current |
Nik Muhammad Hanafi Nik Abdullah
Bandar Seri Putra, 43000 Kajang, Selangor Darul Ehsan,
Address used since 13 Dec 2012 |
Director | 18 Jun 2010 - current |
Steven Alexander Riddell
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 24 Jun 2023
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 29 Jul 2022
Belbowrie, Queensland, 4070
Address used since 24 Mar 2022
Auckland, 1010
Address used since 01 May 2021 |
Director | 01 May 2021 - current |
Michael Shane Doeg
Beachlands, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 16 Nov 2021 |
Director | 16 Nov 2021 - current |
Glenn David Stapleton
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 30 Oct 2020 |
Director | 30 Oct 2020 - 07 Oct 2021 |
David Wheatley Blanchard
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 26 May 2014 - 01 May 2021 |
Christopher Hugh Brown
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 12 May 2015 |
Director | 12 May 2015 - 30 Oct 2020 |
Nik Muhammad Hanafi Bin Nik Abdullah
Bandar Seri Putra, 43000 Kajang, Selangor Darul Ehsan,
Address used since 13 Dec 2012 |
Director | 18 Jun 2010 - 01 Oct 2020 |
John Peter Keenan
Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012
Address used since 28 Nov 2008 |
Director | 28 Nov 2008 - 22 May 2014 |
Mei Mei Chow
Mon't Kiara, 50480 Kuala Lumpur, Malaysia,
Address used since 01 Apr 2009 |
Director | 01 Nov 2004 - 18 Jun 2010 |
Alan James Cockrell
Palmerston North,
Address used since 01 May 1992 |
Director | 01 May 1992 - 28 Nov 2008 |
Sek Kew Lai
Singapore 805659,
Address used since 30 Jun 2004 |
Director | 30 Jun 2004 - 28 Nov 2008 |
Jon Khiam Yip
2/3 Damansara Utama, 47400 Petaling Jaya, Selangor, Malaysia,
Address used since 01 Nov 2004 |
Director | 01 Nov 2004 - 20 Feb 2006 |
Lawrence Cheow Hock Lee
16 Amber Road, Singapore 439866,
Address used since 30 Jun 2004 |
Director | 30 Jun 2004 - 01 Nov 2004 |
Marc Alexander Singleton
Singapore 589886,
Address used since 30 Jun 2004 |
Director | 30 Jun 2004 - 17 Sep 2004 |
Stuart Jamieson Jamirson
Mairangi Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Mar 2000 |
Director | 31 Mar 2000 - 29 Oct 2002 |
Mark Phillip Herbert
Onehunga, Auckland,
Address used since 31 Mar 2000 |
Director | 31 Mar 2000 - 05 Feb 2001 |
Peter Hanbury Masfen
Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Aug 1997 |
Director | 18 Aug 1997 - 31 Mar 2000 |
Bryan William Mogridge
Titirangi, Auckland,
Address used since 18 Jan 1993 |
Director | 18 Jan 1993 - 18 Aug 1997 |
29 Malden Street , Roslyn , Palmerston North , 4414 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sime Darby Commercial (nz) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040893921 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Palmerston North |
22 Dec 1980 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Palmerston North Motors Wholesale Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040885629 Company Number: 22627 Entity |
22 Dec 1980 - 08 Sep 2005 | |
Palmerston North Motors Wholesale Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429040885629 Company Number: 22627 Entity |
22 Dec 1980 - 08 Sep 2005 |
Effective Date | 23 Mar 2022 |
Name | Sime Darby Berhad |
Type | Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 21143 |
Country of origin | MY |
Address |
29 Malden St Palmerston North |
Ud Truck Distributors (nz) Limited 29 Malden Street |
|
Truck Stops (nz) Limited 29 Malden Street |
|
Hino Distributors (nz) Limited 29 Malden Street |
|
Sime Darby Commercial (nz) Limited 29 Malden Street |