Top Northland Management & Financial Services Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040824123) was started on 21 Jul 1976. 1 address is in use by the company: 114 Bank St, Whangarei, 0140 (type: physical, registered). Kevin Bradley, Chartered Accountants, 114 Bank St, Whangarei had been their physical address, up to 05 Dec 2014. Top Northland Management & Financial Services Limited used other aliases, namely: Bay Aluminium Ltd from 21 Jul 1976 to 22 Jul 1991. 20000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.01 per cent of shares), namely:
David Allen (an individual) located at Northland, Wellington. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 100 per cent of all shares (19999 shares); it includes
Michael Allen (an individual) - located at Wangarei. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 11 Jun 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
114 Bank St, Whangarei, 0140 | Registered | 06 Dec 2013 |
114 Bank St, Whangarei, 0140 | Physical | 05 Dec 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael John Allen
Wangarei, 0112
Address used since 04 Dec 2015 |
Director | 06 Jun 1991 - current |
Leonard Ross Ogilvie Mashlan
Whangarei,
Address used since 06 Jun 1991 |
Director | 06 Jun 1991 - 05 Dec 2006 |
Judith Ann Bradley
R.d.4, Whangarei,
Address used since 06 Jun 1991 |
Director | 06 Jun 1991 - 05 Dec 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Kevin Bradley, Chartered Accountants, 114 Bank St, Whangarei, 0140 | Physical | 10 Oct 2011 - 05 Dec 2014 |
Kevin Bradley, Chartered Accountants, 114 Bank St, Whangarei, 0140 | Registered | 10 Oct 2011 - 06 Dec 2013 |
Kevin Bradley Limited, Chartered Accountants, 114 Bank St, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 07 Oct 2002 - 10 Oct 2011 |
C/o Offices Of K B Bradley, 21 Albert Street, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 01 Jul 1997 - 07 Oct 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
David Edward Allen Individual |
Northland Wellington |
21 Jul 1976 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael John Harry Allen Individual |
Wangarei |
21 Jul 1976 - current |
North Trading Limited 114 Bank Street |
|
One Tree Point Harbour View Limited 114 Bank Street |
|
Reinforcing Management Limited 114 Bank Street |
|
Murray Dyer Limited 114 Bank St |
|
Abel Trade Rentals Limited 114 Bank Street |
|
Allied Business Equipment 2008 Limited 114 Bank Street |