H R Jones & Co Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040961033) was started on 11 Aug 1947. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 60 Aorangi Street, Feilding, 4702 (type: registered, physical). Aorangi Street, Feilding had been their physical address, up until 01 Jun 1997. 7000 shares are issued to 7 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 1800 shares (25.71% of shares), namely:
Pickford, Jeremy Daniel Mark (an individual) located at Feilding, Feilding postcode 4702,
Potter, Aisling Rachel (an individual) located at Feilding, Feilding postcode 4702. In the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 72.86% of all shares (5100 shares); it includes
Pickford, Andrea Leslie (an individual) - located at Feilding,
Atkins, Stuart Ian (an individual) - located at Feilding,
Pickford, Mark William (an individual) - located at Feilding. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (40 shares, 0.57%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Pickford, Jeremy Daniel Mark, located at Feilding, Feilding (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
60 Aorangi Street, Feilding, 4702 | Service & physical | 01 Jun 1997 |
60 Aorangi Street, Feilding, 4702 | Registered | 05 Dec 2002 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark W Pickford
Feilding, 4702
Address used since 18 Nov 2015 |
Director | 23 Oct 1985 - current |
Brian J Benge
Feilding,
Address used since 30 Oct 1991 |
Director | 30 Oct 1991 - 29 Mar 2004 |
Edgar J Jones
Feilding,
Address used since 23 Oct 1985 |
Director | 23 Oct 1985 - 19 Sep 1994 |
Ian G Meech
Feilding,
Address used since 30 Oct 1991 |
Director | 30 Oct 1991 - 19 Sep 1994 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Aorangi Street, Feilding | Physical | 01 Jun 1997 - 01 Jun 1997 |
Aorangi St, Feilding | Registered | 21 Mar 1997 - 05 Dec 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pickford, Jeremy Daniel Mark Individual |
Feilding Feilding 4702 |
26 Aug 2022 - current |
Potter, Aisling Rachel Individual |
Feilding Feilding 4702 |
10 Nov 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pickford, Andrea Leslie Individual |
Feilding |
28 Nov 2003 - current |
Atkins, Stuart Ian Individual |
Feilding |
28 Nov 2003 - current |
Pickford, Mark William Individual |
Feilding |
28 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pickford, Jeremy Daniel Mark Individual |
Feilding Feilding 4702 |
26 Aug 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pickford, Mark William Individual |
Feilding |
28 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Benge, Brian John Individual |
Feilding , 'a' Voting |
28 Nov 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Benge, Brian John Individual |
Feilding , 'a' Voting |
28 Nov 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Benge, Brian John Individual |
Feilding , 'a' Voting |
28 Nov 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Evans, Lloyd Individual |
Feilding |
28 Nov 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Benge, Rosalind May Individual |
Feilding |
28 Nov 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Feilding Civic Centre Trust Aorangi Street |
|
Cambria 012 Limited 8 Weld Street |
|
Cambria Commercial 2009 Limited 8 Weld Street |
|
Adhaero It Limited 8 Weld Street |
|
Cambria Residential Limited 8 Weld Street |
|
Otaki Orchards Limited 8 Weld Street |