Fraser Rd Orchard Gp Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429041030486) was incorporated on 12 Dec 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 236-238 The Strand, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 (type: physical, service). 259 The Strand, Whakatane, Whakatane had been their registered address, up until 15 Mar 2019. 2200000 shares are allocated to 13 shareholders who belong to 9 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 220000 shares (10 per cent of shares), namely:
N5 Vic Line Investments Limited (an entity) located at Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui postcode 3116. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 2.5 per cent of all shares (exactly 55000 shares); it includes
Emeny Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at Tauranga,
Cashmore, Andrea (an individual) - located at Tauranga, Tauranga,
Cashmore, Richard Charles (an individual) - located at Tauranga, Tauranga. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (165000 shares, 7.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Anamata 100 Limited, located at Te Puke (an entity). Our information was updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
236-238 The Strand, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 | Physical & service & registered | 15 Mar 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Robert Jones
Rd 6, Te Puke, 3186
Address used since 12 Dec 2013 |
Director | 12 Dec 2013 - current |
Ian James Craig
Coastlands, Whakatane, 3120
Address used since 17 Dec 2013 |
Director | 17 Dec 2013 - current |
Robert Bertram Tait
Rd 5, Tauranga, 3175
Address used since 07 Mar 2017 |
Director | 17 Dec 2013 - current |
Craig Stuart Greenlees
Rd 7, Tauranga, 3179
Address used since 07 Mar 2017 |
Director | 17 Dec 2013 - current |
Dominic Paul Jones
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 31 Jul 2022 |
Director | 31 Jul 2022 - current |
Samuel Arthur Jones
Rd 4, Whakatane, 3194
Address used since 16 Sep 2016 |
Director | 17 Dec 2013 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Dominic Paul Jones
Rd 6, Te Puke, 3186
Address used since 07 Mar 2017 |
Director | 16 Dec 2013 - 02 Feb 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
259 The Strand, Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120 | Registered & physical | 04 Jan 2018 - 15 Mar 2019 |
45 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 | Registered & physical | 26 Sep 2016 - 04 Jan 2018 |
66 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, 4200 | Registered & physical | 09 Jul 2014 - 26 Sep 2016 |
195 Devonport Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 12 Dec 2013 - 09 Jul 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
N5 Vic Line Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047988040 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Maunganui Mount Maunganui 3116 |
14 Dec 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Emeny Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046844347 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
03 Sep 2024 - current |
Cashmore, Andrea Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
23 May 2022 - current |
Cashmore, Richard Charles Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
23 May 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Anamata 100 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048976534 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Te Puke 3183 |
28 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jared Agri Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047020788 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
17 Mar 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharp Tudhope Trustee Services No 27 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032201666 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
23 May 2022 - current |
Craig, Neil John Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
23 May 2022 - current |
Tebbutt, Sheryl Denise Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
23 May 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Madeline Rose Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048920926 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga 3110 |
14 Feb 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Opdamisc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030423183 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
195 Devonport Road Tauranga Null 3110 |
17 Dec 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Michael Thomas Individual |
Rd 6 Pongakawa 3186 |
16 Mar 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Te Kaha Orchards Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030438514 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
17 Dec 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tait, Robert Bertram Director |
Rd 5 Tauranga 3175 |
17 Dec 2013 - 19 Aug 2024 |
Tait, Robert Bertram Director |
Rd 5 Tauranga 3175 |
17 Dec 2013 - 19 Aug 2024 |
Tait, Jane Gibbons Individual |
Rd 5 Tauranga 3175 |
17 Dec 2013 - 19 Aug 2024 |
Tait, Jane Gibbons Individual |
Rd 5 Tauranga 3175 |
17 Dec 2013 - 19 Aug 2024 |
Craig, Ian James Director |
Coastlands Whakatane 3120 |
17 Dec 2013 - 19 Aug 2024 |
Craig, Ian James Director |
Coastlands Whakatane 3120 |
17 Dec 2013 - 19 Aug 2024 |
Foundry Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041940068 Company Number: 5783759 Entity |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 |
16 Sep 2015 - 23 May 2022 |
Jones, Paul Robert Director |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
12 Dec 2013 - 16 Mar 2022 |
Foundry Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041940068 Company Number: 5783759 Entity |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
16 Sep 2015 - 23 May 2022 |
Jones, Samuel Arthur Individual |
Invercargill 9810 |
17 Dec 2013 - 16 Sep 2015 |
Jones, Paul Robert Director |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
12 Dec 2013 - 16 Mar 2022 |
Jones, Patricia Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
17 Dec 2013 - 16 Mar 2022 |
Jones, Patricia Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
17 Dec 2013 - 16 Mar 2022 |
Christie, Alasdair Ewen Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
17 Dec 2013 - 16 Mar 2022 |
Christie, Alasdair Ewen Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
17 Dec 2013 - 16 Mar 2022 |
Samuel Arthur Jones Director |
Invercargill 9810 |
17 Dec 2013 - 16 Sep 2015 |
Jones, Dominic Paul Individual |
Rd 6 Te Puke 3186 |
17 Dec 2013 - 14 Dec 2020 |
Dominic Paul Jones Director |
Rd 6 Te Puke 3186 |
17 Dec 2013 - 14 Dec 2020 |
Whakatane Philatelic Society Incorporated Po Box 114 |
|
Beacon Print Hawkes Bay Limited 32 Pyne Street |
|
Calnar Business Systems (2018) Limited 32 Pyne Street |
|
Beacon Print Limited 32 Pyne Street |
|
Beacon Property Development Limited 32 Pyne Street |
|
Dudfield Bryce Printers Limited 32 Pyne Street |