Greenheart Waipoua Forest Company Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429041057377) was registered on 28 Jan 2014. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 11, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). Level 12, 55 Shortland Street, Auckland had been their registered address, until 11 Jun 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Greenheart Waipoua Company Limited (an other) located at Nos. 77-79 Gloucester Road, Wan Chai, Hong Kong. "Tree cutting or felling - forest" (ANZSIC A030250) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Greenheart Waipoua Forest Company Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 11, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 11 Jun 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wai Chuen Ding
Hong Kong,
Address used since 13 Dec 2018 |
Director | 13 Dec 2018 - current |
Kwok Hong Lai
Petaling Jaya, Selangor, 47410
Address used since 13 Dec 2018 |
Director | 13 Dec 2018 - current |
Neil Robert Geerkens
Kerikeri, 0230
Address used since 01 Nov 2019 |
Director | 01 Nov 2019 - current |
Chun Ho Chen
Tseung Kwan O, New Territories, Hong Kong,
Address used since 01 Jan 2023 |
Director | 01 Jan 2023 - current |
Nga Ying Tse
Broadwood Road, Happy Valley, Hong Kong,
Address used since 21 Sep 2020
Tseung Kwan O, New Territories, Hong Kong,
Address used since 07 Sep 2015 |
Director | 28 Jan 2014 - 01 Jan 2023 |
Michael Reps
Omaha, 0986
Address used since 26 Apr 2018
Rd 6, Warkworth, 0986
Address used since 18 Nov 2016 |
Director | 18 Nov 2016 - 01 Nov 2019 |
Hoe Pin Lim
52-58 Tanner Rd North Point, Hong Kong,
Address used since 05 Sep 2016 |
Director | 04 Jun 2015 - 13 Dec 2018 |
Grant John Fenton
Wanaka, 9395
Address used since 27 Oct 2015 |
Director | 27 Oct 2015 - 05 Dec 2016 |
Samuel Tung Wah Hui
54-56 Blue Pool Road, Happy Valley,
Address used since 28 Jan 2014 |
Director | 28 Jan 2014 - 04 Jun 2015 |
Andrew James Fyfe
9a Kennedy Road, Central,
Address used since 28 Jan 2014 |
Director | 28 Jan 2014 - 01 May 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 12, 55 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 13 Feb 2015 - 11 Jun 2019 |
Level 35, 23 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 28 Jan 2014 - 13 Feb 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Greenheart Waipoua Company Limited Other (Other) |
Nos. 77-79 Gloucester Road, Wan Chai Hong Kong |
28 Jan 2014 - current |
Effective Date | 07 Jan 2022 |
Name | Greenheart Group Limited |
Type | Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 16472 |
Country of origin | BM |
Address |
Victoria Place, 5th Floor 31 Victoria Street Hamilton HM 10 |
S.c. Johnson & Son Proprietary Limited Level 8, 79 Queen St |
|
Nicholls & Maher (nz) Limited Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street |
|
D M Dunningham Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Mj Wyborn Ventures Limited Level 5, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
|
Corvus Oteha Valley Joint Venture Limited Level 4, 52 Symonds Street |
|
Corvus New Zealand Limited Level 4, 52 Symonds Street |
Asian Natural Resources (no.1) Limited Level 4, Hamburg Sud House |
Asian Natural Resources (no.2) Limited Level 4, Hamburg Sud House |
Lgt NZ Limited 125 Swanson Road |
Sj Tree Services Limited 8a View Road |
Cedas Treemen Limited 17 Beryl Place |
Land Clearing Solutions Limited 1092 Ararimu Road |