Oil Burners Nz Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041094198) was incorporated on 13 Feb 2014. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 30A Sayegh Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 (type: registered, service). Rsm House, Level 2, 62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 09 Oct 2023. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 60 shares (60% of shares), namely:
Baldwin, Aaron Geoffrey (a director) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071,
Baldwin, Fiona (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40% of all shares (exactly 40 shares); it includes
Livesey, Mark Allen (an individual) - located at Waitangi, Chatham Islands. "Sales agent for manufacturer or wholesaler" (ANZSIC F380050) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Oil Burners Nz Limited. Our database was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Rsm House, Level 2, 62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Physical | 02 Mar 2020 |
30a Sayegh Street, St Heliers, Auckland, 1071 | Registered & service | 09 Oct 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Aaron Geoffrey Baldwin
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 29 Sep 2023
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 28 Sep 2020
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 29 Sep 2015 |
Director | 13 Feb 2014 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Rsm House, Level 2, 62 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & service | 02 Mar 2020 - 09 Oct 2023 |
Level 2, Rsm House, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical | 13 Sep 2019 - 02 Mar 2020 |
Level 2, Bldg 5, 60 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical | 31 May 2018 - 13 Sep 2019 |
86 Highbrook Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical | 11 Sep 2017 - 31 May 2018 |
Level 1, 86 Highbrook Drive,, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered & physical | 05 Feb 2016 - 11 Sep 2017 |
Level 1, 86 Highbrook Drive,, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Physical | 14 Oct 2015 - 05 Feb 2016 |
Level 1, 86 Highbrook Drive,, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 07 Oct 2015 - 05 Feb 2016 |
Level 1, 86 Highbrook Drive,, East Tamaki 2013, Auckland, 2013 | Physical | 07 Oct 2015 - 14 Oct 2015 |
Level 1, 86 Highbrook Drive,, East Tamaki 2013, Auckland, 2013 | Registered | 13 Feb 2014 - 07 Oct 2015 |
1 Granada Place, Glendowie, Auckland, 1071 | Physical | 13 Feb 2014 - 07 Oct 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Baldwin, Aaron Geoffrey Director |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
13 Feb 2014 - current |
Baldwin, Fiona Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
13 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Livesey, Mark Allen Individual |
Waitangi Chatham Islands 8016 |
13 Feb 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Prince & Partners Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039862013 Company Number: 267846 Entity |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 |
13 Feb 2014 - 29 Sep 2023 |
Yq (nz) Limited 86 Highbrook Drive |
|
Ford Motor Company Of New Zealand Pension Fund Trustee Limited 86 Highbrook Drive |
|
Song And Sons International Limited 86 Highbrook Drive |
|
Core Hr Limited 86 Highbrook Drive |
|
My Tax Back NZ Limited Ford Building |
|
Raymond Abel Dental Limited Ford Building |
Global Defence Solutions Limited 7th Floor, Southern Cross Building |
Itplus Communications Limited Andromeda Crescent |
Elite Garage Doors Limited Level 1, 320 Ti Rakau Drive |
Thortex New Zealand Limited 24 Ellesmere Crescent |
Living Green NZ Limited 5 Hotunui Drive |
Tln Limited 4 Parera Place |