Altessa Services Limited (issued a business number of 9429041191484) was registered on 11 Apr 2014. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 39B Torrance Street, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, service). Flat 3, 41 Torrance Street, Epsom, Glen Eden had been their registered address, until 16 Nov 2022. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Ruiz Acosta, Ana Cecilia (a director) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1023. "Educational support services nec" (ANZSIC P822020) is the classification the ABS issued Altessa Services Limited. Our information was last updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Flat 4, 33 Tawhiri Road, One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 25 Oct 2018 |
Flat 3, 41 Torrance Street, Epsom, Auckland, 0602 | Registered & physical & service | 16 Nov 2022 |
39b Torrance Street, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & service | 14 Sep 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ana Cecilia Ruiz Acosta
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 06 Sep 2023
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 18 Aug 2022
Howick, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 08 Dec 2015
One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 27 Nov 2018 |
Director | 11 Apr 2014 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 3, 41 Torrance Street, Epsom, Glen Eden, 0602 | Registered & physical | 26 Aug 2022 - 16 Nov 2022 |
Flat 4, 33 Tawhiri Road, One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical | 02 Nov 2018 - 26 Aug 2022 |
19 Landop Terrace, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & registered | 16 Dec 2015 - 02 Nov 2018 |
6 Hardie Street, Mangere East, Auckland, 2024 | Registered & physical | 11 Apr 2014 - 16 Dec 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ruiz Acosta, Ana Cecilia Director |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
11 Apr 2014 - current |
Good Fortune Trading Limited 21 Landop Terrace |
|
Your Life Counts! (nz) 12 Gills Road |
|
Keegan Motors Limited 62 Bleakhouse Road |
|
Songhurst Builders Limited 16 Landop Terrace |
|
Downes No 1 Limited 57 Bleakhouse Road |
|
Satgur Enterprises Limited 150 Hutchinsons Road |
Smart Learning Solutions 2015 Limited 63 Ridge Road |
Itravel Education And Tourism Service Limited 40a O'halloran Road |
Maker Studio New Zealand Limited 3 Lisa Rise |
Green Vine Limited 1 Northpark Avenue |
Huayi International Education & Culture Limited 17 Kaniere Place |
Optimal Education & Travel Limited 16 Veagh Place |