Plutus Capital Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041235492) was launched on 14 May 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 15 Monte Cassino Place, Birkdale, Auckland, 0626 (type: registered, physical). Level 15 West Plaza, 1-3 Albert Street, Auckland had been their registered address, until 20 Nov 2019. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Aylmer Ptc Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Lynfield, Auckland postcode 1041,
Zhemchugova, Iryna (a director) located at Birkdale, Auckland postcode 0626. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Plutus Capital Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
15 Monte Cassino Place, Birkdale, Auckland, 0626 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Iryna Zhemchugova
Birkdale, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 14 May 2014 |
Director | 14 May 2014 - current |
Geoffrey Stewart Pownall
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 18 Jun 2020 |
Director | 18 Jun 2020 - current |
Antony Reginald Brokenshire
Hauraki, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 15 Apr 2019 |
Director | 15 Apr 2019 - 08 May 2019 |
Adam Gregory Mcdonnell
Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 19 Feb 2018 |
Director | 15 Jan 2018 - 29 Apr 2019 |
David Frank Willis
Auckland, 0622
Address used since 20 Mar 2015 |
Director | 08 Sep 2014 - 01 Feb 2018 |
Michael John Reynolds
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 28 Jul 2016 |
Director | 08 Sep 2014 - 09 Feb 2017 |
Geoffrey Stewart Pownall
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 14 May 2014 |
Director | 14 May 2014 - 08 Sep 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 15 West Plaza, 1-3 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 16 Jul 2014 - 20 Nov 2019 |
Level 15 West Plaza, Cnr Albert & Fanshawe Streets, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 14 May 2014 - 16 Jul 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aylmer Ptc Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041448595 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Lynfield Auckland 1041 |
10 Nov 2014 - current |
Zhemchugova, Iryna Director |
Birkdale Auckland 0626 |
10 Nov 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhemchugova, Iryna Director |
Birkdale Auckland 0626 |
14 May 2014 - 18 Sep 2014 |
Anchor Investment Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037936068 Company Number: 889796 Entity |
18 Sep 2014 - 10 Nov 2014 | |
Anchor Investment Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037936068 Company Number: 889796 Entity |
18 Sep 2014 - 10 Nov 2014 |
Kirkland Morrison O'callahan & Ho Limited Level 9, West Plaza |
|
Hedgebook Limited 3 Albert Street |
|
Technology One New Zealand Limited Level 14 |
|
Fundertech Limited Level 8 |
|
Gel Limited 9 Albert Street |
|
Wadhwa Limited Shop 5, 9 Albert Street |
Scwz Trustee Limited Unit 9b, 17 Albert Street |
Ten Pebble Corporate Trust Limited Unit 4a, 20 Wolfe Street |
Scarlet Trustee Limited Apartment 2302 Stamford Residences, 26 Albert Street |
Klouwens Trustee Limited Level 20 |
Transaction Services Corporate Trustee Limited Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, Level 20 |
Macqueen Trustee Limited 188 |