Kade Kings Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041363409) was started on 12 Aug 2014. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 19 Mackelvie Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 (type: delivery, postal). 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Swl Trustee Company (2014) Limited (an entity) located at Grey Lynn, Auckland postcode 1021. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the classification the ABS issued to Kade Kings Limited. Our data was updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
19 Mackelvie Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Aug 2014 |
19 Mackelvie Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Postal & office | 07 Nov 2019 |
19 Mackelvie Street, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Delivery | 08 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Megan Anne Williams
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 12 Aug 2014 - current |
Anthony Charles Reginald Steindle
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 12 Aug 2014 |
Director | 12 Aug 2014 - current |
19 Mackelvie Street , Grey Lynn , Auckland , 1021 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Swl Trustee Company (2014) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041076590 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
26 Jun 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Providence Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041362693 Company Number: 5420869 Entity |
12 Aug 2014 - 26 Jun 2015 | |
The Providence Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041362693 Company Number: 5420869 Entity |
12 Aug 2014 - 26 Jun 2015 |
World Trustees Limited 19 Mackelvie Street, Ponsonby |
|
Wave Rider Holdings Limited 19 Mackelvie Street |
|
Swl Trustee Company (2013) Limited 19 Mackelvie Street, |
|
Swl Trustee Company (2012) Limited 19 Mackelvie Street |
|
Swl Trustee Company (2011) Limited 19 Mackelvie Street, |
|
Swl Trustee Company (2010) Limited 19 Mackelvie Street, |
Gjn Trustee (thornton) Limited 2 Crummer Road |
Startup Holdings Limited Unit 11e Hopetoun Residences, 15 Hopetoun Street |
Micmac Investments Limited 41 Charlotte Street |
Macmic Investments Limited 41 Charlotte Street |
Gilt Edged Investments Limited 330 New North Road |
Nash Murray Trustee Company Limited 24b Schofield Street |