Mk Trustee 2022 Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041438367) was registered on 14 Oct 2014. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Floor 7, 126 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, service). 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington had been their physical address, until 07 Aug 2019. Mk Trustee 2022 Limited used more names, namely: Mk Trustee (J G & S M Clark) Limited from 02 Oct 2014 to 01 Dec 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Morrison Kent Limited (an entity) located at Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the ABS issued to Mk Trustee 2022 Limited. Our information was last updated on 10 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Aug 2019 |
Floor 7, 126 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & service | 24 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew James Stewart
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 14 Oct 2014 |
Director | 14 Oct 2014 - current |
Matthew Peter Whimp
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 29 Nov 2016 |
Director | 14 Oct 2014 - current |
Murray George Harden
Raumati South, Paraparaumu, 5032
Address used since 01 Dec 2021
Whitby, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 01 Jun 2017 |
Director | 14 Oct 2014 - current |
Jamie Nicholas Callinicos Nunns
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 11 May 2023 |
Director | 11 May 2023 - current |
Tessa Faye Doherty
Rd 1, Porirua, 5381
Address used since 29 Jun 2023 |
Director | 29 Jun 2023 - current |
Richard Hudson Caughley
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 12 Mar 2020
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 14 Oct 2014 |
Director | 14 Oct 2014 - 08 Nov 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 14 Oct 2014 - 07 Aug 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morrison Kent Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035413851 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
30 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart, Andrew James Director |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
14 Oct 2014 - 30 Jul 2019 |
Whimp, Matthew Peter Director |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 |
14 Oct 2014 - 30 Jul 2019 |
Effective Date | 29 Jul 2019 |
Name | Morrison Kent Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1510047 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
Karma Drinks Limited Level 19 |
|
Mk Trustee (ktg) Limited 105 The Terrace |
|
Rosco Ice Cream Limited 105 The Terrace |
|
Wayfairer Limited Level 19 |
|
Alco Trustee Limited Level 19 |
|
All Good Bananas Limited Level 19 |
Waterfall Bay Trustee No. 1 Limited 105 The Terrace |
Trison Management Services Limited Level 19 |
Mk Trustee (gibbons) Limited 105 The Terrace |
Tofino Trustee Limited 89 The Terrace |
Treadwells Trustee Services Limited Level 14 |
Treadwells Trustees 11 Limited Level 14 |