Cnz Connect Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429041497371) was started on 13 Nov 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 107 Macandrew Road, South Dunedin, Dunedin, 9012 (type: registered, physical). 88B Queens Drive, St Kilda, Dunedin had been their physical address, until 21 Jun 2021. 10000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 9000 shares (90% of shares), namely:
Zhang, Zhiwei Felix (an individual) located at South Dunedin, Dunedin postcode 9012. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10% of all shares (exactly 1000 shares); it includes
Zhou, Yu (a director) - located at Macandrew Road, Dunedin. "Travel agency service" (business classification N722060) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Cnz Connect Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
107 Macandrew Road, South Dunedin, Dunedin, 9012 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Jun 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Yu Zhou
South Dunedin, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 30 Nov 2023
Macandrew Road, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 02 Nov 2021
Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010
Address used since 17 Mar 2015
St Kilda, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 01 Apr 2019 |
Director | 13 Nov 2014 - current |
Zhiwei Zhang
South Dunedin, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 26 Oct 2023 |
Director | 26 Oct 2023 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
88b Queens Drive, St Kilda, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 09 Apr 2019 - 21 Jun 2021 |
330 Highgate, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 | Physical | 25 Mar 2015 - 09 Apr 2019 |
330 Highgate, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 | Registered | 13 Feb 2015 - 09 Apr 2019 |
330a Highgate, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 | Registered | 13 Nov 2014 - 13 Feb 2015 |
330a Highgate, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 | Physical | 13 Nov 2014 - 25 Mar 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhang, Zhiwei Felix Individual |
South Dunedin Dunedin 9012 |
26 Oct 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhou, Yu Director |
Macandrew Road Dunedin 9012 |
13 Nov 2014 - current |
Dunedin Chinese Language And Culture Trust 339 Highate |
|
Highton Property Limited 347 Highgate |
|
The Daleham Group Limited 355 Highgate |
|
Dr.fiona Partridge Limited 359 Highgate |
|
Dr Michael J. A. Williams Limited 359 Highgate |
|
Strathburn Trustee Limited 359 Highgate |
Dj Travel Limited 134 North Road |
World Travellers South Otago Limited 102 Clyde Street |
Indafrica Travel Marketing Limited 1 Cobb Court |
Loco Journeys Limited 34 Quill Street |
Pure Travel Limited 16 Sandford Terrace |
Alcamy Limited 6 Takahe Lane |