Bill Subritzky Trustee Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041508565) was launched on 21 Nov 2014. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: Flat 3, 167 Tamaki Drive, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 (type: registered, service). Flat 4, 37 Tamaki Drive, Mission Bay, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 20 Nov 2018. 1000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 5 entities and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Subritzky, Paul Keith (an individual) located at Kohimarama, Auckland postcode 1071,
Subritzky, John Wilfred (an individual) located at Lynfield, Auckland postcode 1042,
Breetvelt, Janne Kathleen (an individual) located at Mission Bay, Auckland postcode 1071. Our data was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
24 Royal Viking Way, Lynfield, Auckland, 1042 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Nov 2018 |
Unit A, Building 1, 100 Bush Road, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Records & shareregister | 21 Jun 2023 |
Flat 3, 167 Tamaki Drive, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Registered & service | 13 Dec 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kaylene Anne Subritzky
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 04 Jul 2023
Auckland, 1071
Address used since 05 Jan 2016 |
Director | 05 Jan 2016 - current |
Maria Anne Subritzky
Rd 4, Hikurangi, 0184
Address used since 01 Jun 2022
Auckland, 1071
Address used since 05 Jan 2016 |
Director | 05 Jan 2016 - current |
Paul Keith Subritzky
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Dec 2023
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 05 Jan 2016 |
Director | 05 Jan 2016 - current |
John Wilfred Subritzky
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 05 Jan 2016 |
Director | 05 Jan 2016 - current |
Janne Kathleen Breetvelt
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Jul 2021
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 05 Jan 2016 |
Director | 05 Jan 2016 - current |
Wilfred Allen Subritzky
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Nov 2015 |
Director | 21 Nov 2014 - 07 Jan 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 4, 37 Tamaki Drive, Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 | Physical & registered | 19 Nov 2015 - 20 Nov 2018 |
Flat 5, 45 Tamaki Drive, Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 | Physical & registered | 21 Nov 2014 - 19 Nov 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Subritzky, Paul Keith Individual |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
05 Jan 2016 - current |
Subritzky, John Wilfred Individual |
Lynfield Auckland 1042 |
05 Jan 2016 - current |
Breetvelt, Janne Kathleen Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
05 Jan 2016 - current |
Subritzky, Maria Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Hikurangi 0184 |
05 Jan 2016 - current |
Subritzky, Kaylene Anne Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
05 Jan 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Subritzky, Wilfred Allen Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
21 Nov 2014 - 05 Jan 2016 |
Wilfred Allen Subritzky Director |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
21 Nov 2014 - 05 Jan 2016 |
Kaylene Trustee Limited 4/37 Tamaki Drive |
|
Garden Escape Limited 2 A Atkin Avenue |
|
Mission Bay Medical Limited 10 Marau Crescent |
|
Mission Bay Doctors Limited 10 Marau Crescent |
|
Mission Management Limited 7e Atkin Avenue |
|
The Dragonfly Trustee Limited 2/1 Marau Crescent |