Cosmo Consumer Brands Limited (NZBN 9429041531969) was launched on 08 Dec 2014. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 219 Don Mckinnon Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, service). 72 Gladstone Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 12 Nov 2018. 100000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 50000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Burge, Suzanne (an individual) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052,
Suzanne Burge (a director) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1052. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50000 shares); it includes
Shen, Qing (an individual) - located at East Tamaki, Auckland. "Business consultant service" (ANZSIC M696205) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Cosmo Consumer Brands Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
44a Crooks Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013 | Physical & registered | 12 Nov 2018 |
219 Don Mckinnon Drive, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & service | 20 Dec 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Qing Shen
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 18 Jan 2022
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 10 Dec 2018
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 04 May 2015
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 04 Mar 2018 |
Director | 04 May 2015 - current |
Suzanne Burge
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 08 Dec 2014 |
Director | 08 Dec 2014 - 01 Jan 2023 |
72 Gladstone Road , Parnell , Auckland , 1052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
72 Gladstone Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered | 08 Dec 2014 - 12 Nov 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burge, Suzanne Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
03 Apr 2023 - current |
Suzanne Burge Director |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
08 Dec 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shen, Qing Individual |
East Tamaki Auckland 2013 |
04 May 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burge, Suzanne Individual |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
08 Dec 2014 - 13 Jan 2023 |
Gladstone Pharmacy Parnell Limited 72 Gladstone Road |
|
Parnell Physiotherapy Clinic Limited 72a Gladstone Road |
|
Pyatt Holdings Limited 72 Gladstone Road |
|
Raval International Limited Shop 2, 2/64 Gladstone Road, Parnell |
|
Hy Raval Limited Flat 2, 64 Gladstone Road |
|
Epicure Press Limited 2 Stanwell Street |
Virtual Marketing Limited 8 Taurarua Terrace |
Jane Yeh Services Limited Unit 6, 7 Cleveland Road |
Engineering Recruiters Limited Unit 1, 12 Balfour Rd |
Emerge Business Solutions Limited 1/17 Judges Bay Road |
Datamine Limited 15 Faraday Street |
Quantum Capital Limited 22 Alberon Street |