Soletanche Bachy International (Nz) Limited (issued a business number of 9429041662250) was incorporated on 26 Mar 2015. 6 addresess are in use by the company: Landmark House, Level 6, 187 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Landmark House, Level 6, 187 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 15 Sep 2021. 600 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 600 shares (100% of shares). "Civil engineering - road or bridge construction" (business classification E310140) is the classification the ABS issued to Soletanche Bachy International (Nz) Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 105224, Auckland City, Auckland, 1143 | Postal & invoice | 21 Jul 2021 |
Landmark House, Level 6, 187 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Office & delivery | 21 Jul 2021 |
Landmark House, Level 6, 187 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & service | 29 Jul 2021 |
Landmark House, Level 6, 187 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 15 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bernard T. | Director | 25 Mar 2022 - current |
Arnaud Francois Chapuis
South Coogee, Nsw, 2034
Address used since 22 Sep 2022
Nsw, 2113
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 22 Sep 2022 - current |
Alexis B. | Director | 17 Nov 2022 - current |
Philippe Begou
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 19 Jun 2017 |
Director | 19 May 2017 - 20 Sep 2022 |
Jean-luc G. | Director | 26 Mar 2015 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Matthew Guy Edwin March
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 26 Mar 2015 |
Director | 26 Mar 2015 - 31 Aug 2020 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Landmark House, Level 6, 187 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 15 Sep 2021 |
Landmark House, Level 6 , 187 Queen Street , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Landmark House, Level 6, 187 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 29 Jul 2021 - 15 Sep 2021 |
Level 10, 21 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 31 Aug 2020 - 29 Jul 2021 |
1220 Main North Road, Kainga, Christchurch, 8083 | Physical & registered | 17 Oct 2018 - 17 Oct 2018 |
Level 3, 25 College Hill, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical | 21 Sep 2018 - 17 Oct 2018 |
1220 Main North Road, Kainga, Christchurch, 8083 | Registered & physical | 26 Mar 2015 - 21 Sep 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
517958658 Rcs Nanterre - Soletanche Bachy International Other (Other) |
26 Mar 2015 - current |
Effective Date | 01 May 2022 |
Name | Vinci Sa |
Type | Registered Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 552037806 |
Country of origin | FR |
Main North Road Holdings Limited 1220 Main North Road |
|
Main North Road Investment Company Limited 1220 Main North Road |
|
Contract Equipment Limited 1220 Main North Road |
|
Contract Machinery Limited 1220 Main North Road |
|
Hornby Land Developments Limited 1220 Main North Rd. |
Daniel Smith Industries Limited 315 Flaxton Road |
Fulton Hogan Limited 15 Sir William Pickering Drive |
Hunter Civil Limited Flat 11, 75 Gloucester Street |
Michael Hannan Project Services Limited 13 Hegan Place |
K B Contracting & Quarries Limited 4-8 Tanya Street |
Dukie Consulting Limited 86 Waipapa Avenue |