Pintas Incorporation Limited (NZBN 9429041701669) was launched on 28 Apr 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Floor 3, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their physical address, until 18 Jun 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
New Zealand Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 3, 32 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Geoffrey Peter Cone
Br Balneario Santa Monica Loc La Barra, Maldonado,
Address used since 28 Apr 2015 |
Director | 28 Apr 2015 - current |
Jorge Enrique Gomez Serra
Urb Sebucan Sucre Caracas, Miranda, 1071
Address used since 11 May 2015 |
Director | 11 May 2015 - current |
Diomedes Nilecta Serra De Gomez
Doral Castellana 01a Chacao, Capital District,
Address used since 11 May 2015 |
Director | 11 May 2015 - current |
Patricia Gomez Serra
Ed Trrz Sebucan A, Sucre,
Address used since 11 May 2015 |
Director | 11 May 2015 - current |
Claire Judith Cooke
Pyes Pa, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 13 May 2017 |
Director | 13 May 2017 - current |
Claudia Shan
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 13 May 2017 |
Director | 13 May 2017 - 19 Feb 2024 |
Karen Anne Marshall
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 12 Dec 2019
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 28 Apr 2015 |
Director | 28 Apr 2015 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 18 Stanley Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 28 Apr 2015 - 18 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
New Zealand Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036803293 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
28 Apr 2015 - current |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |