Poplar Dairy Farm Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429041706473) was started on 21 Apr 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa, 3640 (type: physical, registered). 2400 shares are allocated to 9 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 720 shares (30% of shares), namely:
Paeroa Trust Management Limited (an entity) located at 25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa,
Tretheway, Craig (an individual) located at Rd 1, Waihi postcode 3681. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 45% of all shares (1080 shares); it includes
R Arthur Trustee Limited (an entity) - located at Hamilton Central, Hamilton,
Arthur, Ronald Dale (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Waihi. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (120 shares, 5%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Hfn White Trustee Company Limited, located at Rd 2, Waihi (an entity),
Se White Trustee Company Limited, located at Rd 2, Waihi (an entity). "Dairy cattle farming" (ANZSIC A016010) is the category the ABS issued to Poplar Dairy Farm Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa, 3640 | Physical & registered & service | 21 Apr 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ronald Dale Arthur
Rd 1, Waihi, 3681
Address used since 21 Apr 2015 |
Director | 21 Apr 2015 - current |
Bruce Trafford Nicol
Paeroa, Paeroa, 3600
Address used since 21 Apr 2015 |
Director | 21 Apr 2015 - current |
Craig Tretheway
Rd 1, Waihi, 3681
Address used since 04 Dec 2017 |
Director | 04 Dec 2017 - current |
Kevin Maurice Luckie
Paeroa, Paeroa, 3600
Address used since 21 Apr 2015 |
Director | 21 Apr 2015 - 04 Dec 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paeroa Trust Management Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038949692 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
25 Willoughby Street Paeroa |
21 Apr 2015 - current |
Tretheway, Craig Individual |
Rd 1 Waihi 3681 |
04 May 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
R Arthur Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051332747 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
04 Jul 2023 - current |
Arthur, Ronald Dale Individual |
Rd 1 Waihi 3681 |
21 Apr 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hfn White Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048368544 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 2 Waihi 3682 |
29 Apr 2022 - current |
Se White Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048368650 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 2 Waihi 3682 |
29 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Luckie, Wendy Anne Individual |
Rd 4 Paeroa 3674 |
21 Apr 2015 - current |
Luckie, Kevin Maurice Individual |
Rd 4 Paeroa 3674 |
21 Apr 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kirby, Robyn Individual |
Rd 1 Waihi 3681 |
21 Apr 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bryant, Cecil Mark Individual |
Katikati 3177 |
06 May 2015 - 22 Jan 2024 |
Onemata Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046458858 Company Number: 6549737 Entity |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
26 Nov 2018 - 22 Jan 2024 |
Bryant, Cecil Mark Individual |
Katikati 3177 |
06 May 2015 - 22 Jan 2024 |
Bryant, Cecil Mark Individual |
Katikati 3177 |
06 May 2015 - 22 Jan 2024 |
Bryant, Cecil Mark Individual |
Katikati 3177 |
06 May 2015 - 22 Jan 2024 |
Bryant, Cecil Vickery Individual |
Rd 2 Tauranga 3172 |
06 May 2015 - 26 Aug 2022 |
Thomson, Russell Laird Individual |
Te Kuiti Te Kuiti 3910 |
06 May 2015 - 26 Nov 2018 |
Trustee Co (kat) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042528784 Company Number: 6090232 Entity |
Waihi 3610 |
15 Jan 2021 - 04 Jul 2023 |
Robertson, Keith Individual |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
21 Apr 2015 - 28 Apr 2022 |
Nicol, Bruce Trafford Individual |
Paeroa Paeroa 3600 |
21 Apr 2015 - 15 Jan 2021 |
Williams, Glenn Individual |
Rd 1 Waihi 3681 |
04 May 2015 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Bryant, Cecil Vickery Individual |
Rd 2 Tauranga 3172 |
06 May 2015 - 26 Aug 2022 |
White, Susan Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 2 Waihi 3682 |
12 May 2015 - 29 Apr 2022 |
Mcpherson, Murray David Individual |
Katikati 3177 |
12 May 2015 - 29 Apr 2022 |
Nicol, Bruce Trafford Individual |
Paeroa Paeroa 3600 |
21 Apr 2015 - 15 Jan 2021 |
Nicol, Bruce Trafford Individual |
Paeroa Paeroa 3600 |
21 Apr 2015 - 15 Jan 2021 |
Williams, Sally Individual |
Rd 1 Waihi 3681 |
04 May 2015 - 18 Jul 2018 |
Luckie Property Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Lyngary Farm Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
O`hara Construction Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Surfside Property Holdings Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Profarm Investments Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
|
Arquette Investments Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
Rua Farming Company Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
Arthur Farms Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
Landbrug Jerseys Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
Bishop Farms Oxford Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
W-g Dairies Limited 25 Willoughby Street |
Kopuatai Farm Limited 25 Willoughby Street |