Summit Haulage Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041752692) was started on 13 May 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 1 Pitcairn Street, Oakura, Oakura, 4314 (type: registered, physical). 30 Ainslee Street, Highlands Park, New Plymouth had been their registered address, until 01 Jul 2019. Summit Haulage Limited used more names, namely: Niex Farms Limited from 12 May 2015 to 01 Nov 2017. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 200 shares (20% of shares), namely:
Nicholas Lawn (a director) located at Oakura, Oakura postcode 4314. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 80% of all shares (exactly 800 shares); it includes
Dex Newland (a director) - located at Rd 2, New Plymouth. "Dairy cattle farming" (business classification A016010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Summit Haulage Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 21 Mar 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Pitcairn Street, Oakura, Oakura, 4314 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 08 Jun 2019 |
1 Pitcairn Street, Oakura, Oakura, 4314 | Registered & physical | 01 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholas John Lawn
Oakura, Oakura, 4314
Address used since 08 Jun 2019
Highlands Park, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 29 Jun 2016 |
Director | 13 May 2015 - current |
Dex Joseph Newland
Rd 2, New Plymouth, 4372
Address used since 27 May 2020
Fitzroy, New Plymouth, 4312
Address used since 29 Jun 2016 |
Director | 13 May 2015 - current |
1 Pitcairn Street , Oakura , Oakura , 4314 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
30 Ainslee Street, Highlands Park, New Plymouth, 4312 | Registered & physical | 07 Jul 2016 - 01 Jul 2019 |
235 Heta Road, Merrilands, New Plymouth, 4312 | Physical & registered | 13 May 2015 - 07 Jul 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholas John Lawn Director |
Oakura Oakura 4314 |
13 May 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dex Joseph Newland Director |
Rd 2 New Plymouth 4372 |
13 May 2015 - current |
Haddawi Surgery Limited 22 Ainslee Street |
|
C & K Andrews Limited 11 Anderson Way |
|
Ingenuity Limited 96d Branch Road |
|
Js Hospitality Limited 82a Branch Road |
|
Jesus Saves Ministries 96c Branch Road |
|
Merrilands Cricket Club Incorporated C/o Peter Brown |
Shellmar Farms Limited 369 Devon Street |
Gd & Cj Alexander Limited 369 Devon Street |
Pease & Co Limited 369 Devon Street East |
Anlm Limited 369 Devon Street |
Twisted Acres Limited 369 Devon Street |
Proform Farm Limited 369 Devon Street |