Chapman Trustees No 2 Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429041798096) was incorporated on 11 Jun 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 329 Durham Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: physical, registered). Suite 2, 21 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 22 Jul 2015. 1 share is issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Tavendale, Mark Jonathan (a director) located at Merivale, Christchurch postcode 8014,
Mccarron, Paul Francis (a director) located at Bryndwr, Christchurch postcode 8052. Our database was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
329 Durham Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered & service | 22 Jul 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Francis Mccarron
Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 05 Aug 2022
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 11 Jun 2015 |
Director | 11 Jun 2015 - current |
Mark Jonathan Tavendale
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 31 Jul 2021 |
Director | 31 Jul 2021 - current |
Mark John Dineen
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 11 Jun 2015 |
Director | 11 Jun 2015 - 30 Jul 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 2, 21 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered | 11 Jun 2015 - 22 Jul 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tavendale, Mark Jonathan Director |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 |
28 Oct 2021 - current |
Mccarron, Paul Francis Director |
Bryndwr Christchurch 8052 |
11 Jun 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dineen, Mark John Individual |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 |
11 Jun 2015 - 28 Oct 2021 |
Jka Trustees Limited 329 Durham Street |
|
Tavendale Trustees Limited 329 Durham Street |
|
Caseley Trustees Limited 329 Durham Street |
|
S&k Molloy Trustees Limited 329 Durham Street |
|
Robbie Larkin Trustees Limited 329 Durham Street |
|
Trustee 016131 Limited 329 Durham Street |