Crm Group Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041805435) was registered on 15 Jun 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 349 Ngariki Road, Rd 34, Opunake, 4684 (type: registered, physical). 819 Oeo Road, Rd 28, Hawera had been their physical address, up until 08 Jun 2022. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Morgan, Cody Robert (a director) located at Rd 34, Opunake postcode 4684. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Morgan, Kate Elizabeth (a director) - located at Rd 34, Opunake. "Milk production - dairy cattle" (ANZSIC A016020) is the category the ABS issued Crm Group Limited. Our data was last updated on 28 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
349 Ngariki Road, Rd 34, Opunake, 4684 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Jun 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Cody Robert Morgan
Rd 34, Opunake, 4684
Address used since 30 May 2022
Rd 28, Hawera, 4678
Address used since 19 Jun 2020
Rd 34, Opunake, 4684
Address used since 15 Jun 2015 |
Director | 15 Jun 2015 - current |
Kate Elizabeth Morgan
Rd 34, Opunake, 4684
Address used since 30 May 2022
Rd 28, Hawera, 4678
Address used since 19 Jun 2020
Rd 34, Opunake, 4684
Address used since 08 May 2019 |
Director | 08 May 2019 - current |
819 Oeo Road , Rd 28 , Hawera , 4678 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
819 Oeo Road, Rd 28, Hawera, 4678 | Physical & registered | 29 Jun 2020 - 08 Jun 2022 |
349 Ngariki Road, Rd 34, Opunake, 4684 | Registered & physical | 15 Jun 2015 - 29 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morgan, Cody Robert Director |
Rd 34 Opunake 4684 |
15 Jun 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morgan, Kate Elizabeth Director |
Rd 34 Opunake 4684 |
21 May 2019 - current |
Rahotu Hall Society Incorporated 129 Kahui Road |
Cdh Farming Limited 152a Pungarehu Road |
Ayvid Limited 295 Ihaia Road |
Wylam Dene Farms Limited Auroa Road Rd 29 |
Mcquaig Trustees Limited 415 Kirihau Road |
Hua Mahi Limited 240 Ahu Ahu Road |
Hurworth Farms Limited 369 Devon Street |